This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2019 at 07:52:18 (UTC).

Knox et al v. Monsanto Company et al

Case Summary

On 05/13/2019 Knox filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Monsanto Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian Morris. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00036

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Montana District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian Morris

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Terry Knox

Carolyn "Coke" Knox

Defendants

Kerry Yates

Monsanto Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Triel D. Culver

Attorney at EDWARDS FRICKLE & CULVER

1648 Poly Drive, Suite 206

Billings, MT 59102

A. Clifford Edwards

Attorney at EDWARDS FRICKLE & CULVER

1648 Poly Drive, Suite 206

Billings, MT 59102

A. Christopher Edwards

Attorney at EDWARDS FRICKLE & CULVER

1648 Poly Drive, Suite 206

Billings, MT 59102

Defendant Attorneys

Randy J. Cox

Attorney at BOONE KARLBERG, P.C.

201 West Main Street, Suite 300, Po Box 9199

Missoula, MT 59807-9199

Robert E. Johnston

Attorney at HOLLINGSWORTH LLP

1350 I Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

 

Court Documents

25 #1

Exhibit A - PowerPoint Presentation

#25

(#25) NOTICE by Monsanto Company, Kerry Yates of Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PowerPoint Presentation) (Cox, Randy) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

#23

(#23) REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Kerry Yates. (Cox, Randy) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#22

(#22) ORDER: The Motion Hearing in this case set for 7/31/19 is VACATED and RESET for 7/10/2019 at 11:00 AM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. #20 MOTION to Vacate Hearing filed by Carolyn "Coke" Knox, Terry Knox is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 6/27/2019. (MMS) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

21 #1

Exhibit Ex A JPML Notice of Hearing Session (Doc 1054)

#21

(#21) Brief/Memorandum in Support re #20 MOTION to Vacate Hearing filed by Carolyn "Coke" Knox, Terry Knox. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A JPML Notice of Hearing Session (Doc 1054)) (Culver, Triel) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

#20

(#20) MOTION to Vacate Hearing Triel D. Culver appearing for Plaintiffs Carolyn "Coke" Knox, Terry Knox (Culver, Triel) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

#11

(#17) TEXT ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #8 MOTION to Remand , #11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Motion Hearing is set for 7/31/2019 at 01:30 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 6/11/2019. (SLL) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#8

(#16) RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Remand filed by Monsanto Company, Kerry Yates. (Cox, Randy) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

5 #5

Affidavit of Service - Yates

5 #3

Order Setting Scheduling Conference

#4

(#4) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 6/5/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 6/5/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 6/5/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 6/12/2019 at 01:30 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 5/13/2019. (MMS) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Corporate Parent Bayer AG for Monsanto Company.. (Cox, Randy) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Monsanto Company. (Cox, Randy) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Kerry Yates

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint

#1

(#5) NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal from Montana Eighth Judicial District Court, Cascade County, consisting of: (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference, #4 Order Substituting Judge, #5 Affidavit of Service - Yates, #6 Affidavit of Service - Monsanto, #7 Motion for Substitution of Judge, #8 Issued Summons - Monsanto, #9 Issued Summons - Yates) (SLR) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) NOTICE by Monsanto Company, Kerry Yates of Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PowerPoint Presentation) (Cox, Randy) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Brian Morris. Counsel Edwards and Culver present on behalf of plaintiffs. Counsel Cox and Gray present on behalf of defendants. Motion Hearing held on 7/10/2019 re #11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Kerry Yates, #8 MOTION to Remand filed by Carolyn "Coke" Knox, Terry Knox Cnsl Culver w/argument. Cnsl Cox w/response. Cnsl Edwards w/rebuttal. Court takes matter under advisement. Hearing commenced at 11:48 and concluded at 12:48. (Court Reporter Yvette Heinze.) (Law Clerk: J. Brown and R. Douglas), (Hearing held in Great Falls, Charles Pray Courtroom) (TLO) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Kerry Yates. (Cox, Randy) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ORDER: The Motion Hearing in this case set for 7/31/19 is VACATED and RESET for 7/10/2019 at 11:00 AM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. #20 MOTION to Vacate Hearing filed by Carolyn "Coke" Knox, Terry Knox is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 6/27/2019. (MMS) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Brief/Memorandum in Support re #20 MOTION to Vacate Hearing filed by Carolyn "Coke" Knox, Terry Knox. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A JPML Notice of Hearing Session (Doc 1054)) (Culver, Triel) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) MOTION to Vacate Hearing Triel D. Culver appearing for Plaintiffs Carolyn "Coke" Knox, Terry Knox (Culver, Triel) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Remand filed by Carolyn "Coke" Knox, Terry Knox. (Culver, Triel) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Carolyn "Coke" Knox, Terry Knox. (Culver, Triel) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) TEXT ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #8 MOTION to Remand , #11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Motion Hearing is set for 7/31/2019 at 01:30 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 6/11/2019. (SLL) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Remand filed by Monsanto Company, Kerry Yates. (Cox, Randy) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Remand Triel D. Culver appearing for Plaintiffs Carolyn "Coke" Knox, Terry Knox (Culver, Triel) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to #6 Complaint with Jury Demand by Kerry Yates. (Cox, Randy) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • Remark: Original State Court documents placed in brown expando file on shelf in Clerk's Office. (SLR) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (State Court) against All Defendants, filed by Terry Knox, Carolyn "Coke" Knox. (SLR) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal from Montana Eighth Judicial District Court, Cascade County, consisting of: (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference, #4 Order Substituting Judge, #5 Affidavit of Service - Yates, #6 Affidavit of Service - Monsanto, #7 Motion for Substitution of Judge, #8 Issued Summons - Monsanto, #9 Issued Summons - Yates) (SLR) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 6/5/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 6/5/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 6/5/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 6/12/2019 at 01:30 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 5/13/2019. (MMS) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Corporate Parent Bayer AG for Monsanto Company.. (Cox, Randy) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Monsanto Company. (Cox, Randy) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0977-2308717 (MMS) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montana Eighth Judicial District Court, Cascade County, Case Number DDV-19-0211. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Kerry Yates, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (MMS) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less