Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 11/12/2019 at 08:14:25 (UTC).

Knowles v. United States of America et al

Case Summary

On 09/13/2019 Knowles filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Dakota District. The Judge overseeing this case is Clare R. Hochhalter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00199

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Dakota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Clare R. Hochhalter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Efrain Reyes Knowles

Bismarck, ND 58502-1416

Defendants

Jail's

DOCR

United States of America

County's

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter denying #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and dismissing complaint without prejudice as to all defendants and all claims. (JS) Distributed on 11/8/2019. (rh) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

7 #1

Mailing Envelope

#7

(#7) OBJECTION by Efrain Reyes Knowles. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(rh) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

5 #1

Mailing Envelope

#5

(#5) CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Efrain Reyes Knowles. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(cjs) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Show Cause Response due by 10/1/2019. (BG) Distributed on 9/17/2019. (rh) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Efrain Reyes Knowles. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/27/2019. (rh) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

#2

(#2) PLRA Packet. (rh) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

1 #1

Mailing Envelope

#1

(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Efrain Reyes Knowles. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(rh) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2019
  • Civil Case Terminated. Case terminated for failure to pay filing fee. Documents returned to inmate. (rh) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter denying #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and dismissing complaint without prejudice as to all defendants and all claims. (JS) Distributed on 11/8/2019. (rh) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Letter from Efrain Knowles (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (cjs) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) OBJECTION by Efrain Reyes Knowles. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(rh) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Letter from Efrain Knowles (Attachments: #1 Inmate Inventory Statements, #2 Mailing Envelope) (am) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Efrain Reyes Knowles. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(cjs) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Show Cause Response due by 10/1/2019. (BG) Distributed on 9/17/2019. (rh) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Efrain Reyes Knowles. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/27/2019. (rh) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PLRA Packet. (rh) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Efrain Reyes Knowles. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(rh) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where D.O.C.R. is a litigant

Latest cases where The County is a litigant