Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/02/2021 at 10:05:53 (UTC).

KNOWLES v. TEMPLE UNIVERSITY BOARD OF TRUSTEES et al

Case Summary

On 02/01/2021 KNOWLES filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against TEMPLE UNIVERSITY BOARD OF TRUSTEES. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE and JOHN M. YOUNGE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00475

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE

JOHN M. YOUNGE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ATINA KNOWLES

Keyport, NJ 07735

Defendants

KRISTIN GJESDAL

DAVID WOLFSDORF

TEMPLE UNIVERSITY BOARD OF TRUSTEES

MIRIAM SOLOMON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

ALPA V. PATEL

Attorney at HAMBURG & GOLDEN, P.C.

1601 Market Street, Suite 3310

Philadelphia, PA 19103

NEIL J. HAMBURG

Attorney at HAMBURG & GOLDEN PC

1601 Market St, Suite 3310

Philadelphia, PA 19103-1443

 

Court Documents

9 #9

Exhibit

9 #8

Exhibit

9 #7

Exhibit

9 #6

Exhibit

9 #5

Exhibit

9 #4

Exhibit

9 #3

Exhibit

9 #2

Exhibit

9 #1

Exhibit

#9

(#9) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by KRISTIN GJESDAL, MIRIAM SOLOMON, TEMPLE UNIVERSITY BOARD OF TRUSTEES, DAVID WOLFSDORF.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(PATEL, ALPA) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by ALPA V. PATEL on behalf of KRISTIN GJESDAL, MIRIAM SOLOMON, TEMPLE UNIVERSITY BOARD OF TRUSTEES, DAVID WOLFSDORF with Certificate of Service(PATEL, ALPA) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by NEIL J. HAMBURG on behalf of KRISTIN GJESDAL, MIRIAM SOLOMON, TEMPLE UNIVERSITY BOARD OF TRUSTEES, DAVID WOLFSDORF with Certificate of Service(HAMBURG, NEIL) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Jodi L. Broder re: served Summons & Complaint upon Terry Coe by Personal Service on 3/2/21 (fdc, ) Modified on 3/9/2021 (tjd). (Entered: 03/08/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER THAT MOTION TO REMAND THIS CASE TO DISTRICT JUDGE YOUNGE'S COURT (ECF NO. 4) IS DENIED BECAUSE THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED ACTION IS ALREADY ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN MILTON YOUNGE, U.S. DISTRICT JUDGE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 3/4/21.3/4/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, ) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

4 #1

Email for motion to remand

#4

(#4) MOTION TO REMAND THIS CASE TO DISTRICT JUDGE YOUNGE' COURT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, FILED BY PRO SE PLFF ATINA KNOWLES. "NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED" (Attachments: #1 Email for motion to remand)(kw, ) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

#3

(#3) ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE TO HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 2/8/21. 2/8/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, ) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

#2

(#2) PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, ) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by KRISTIN GJESDAL, MIRIAM SOLOMON, TEMPLE UNIVERSITY BOARD OF TRUSTEES, DAVID WOLFSDORF.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(PATEL, ALPA) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by ALPA V. PATEL on behalf of KRISTIN GJESDAL, MIRIAM SOLOMON, TEMPLE UNIVERSITY BOARD OF TRUSTEES, DAVID WOLFSDORF with Certificate of Service(PATEL, ALPA) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by NEIL J. HAMBURG on behalf of KRISTIN GJESDAL, MIRIAM SOLOMON, TEMPLE UNIVERSITY BOARD OF TRUSTEES, DAVID WOLFSDORF with Certificate of Service(HAMBURG, NEIL) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Jodi L. Broder re: served Summons & Complaint upon Terry Coe by Personal Service on 3/2/21 (fdc, ) Modified on 3/9/2021 (tjd). (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER THAT MOTION TO REMAND THIS CASE TO DISTRICT JUDGE YOUNGE'S COURT (ECF NO. 4) IS DENIED BECAUSE THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED ACTION IS ALREADY ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN MILTON YOUNGE, U.S. DISTRICT JUDGE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 3/4/21.3/4/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, ) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to KRISTIN GJESDAL, MIRIAM SOLOMON, TEMPLE UNIVERSITY BOARD OF TRUSTEES, DAVID WOLFSDORF. E-Mailed To: Pro Se Plff on 2/18/21. (kw, ) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketFiling fee: $ 402, receipt number PPE224217 (rf, ) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION TO REMAND THIS CASE TO DISTRICT JUDGE YOUNGE' COURT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, FILED BY PRO SE PLFF ATINA KNOWLES. "NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED" (Attachments: #1 Email for motion to remand)(kw, ) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE TO HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 2/8/21. 2/8/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, ) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by ATINA KNOWLES. (bw, ) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, ) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against KRISTIN GJESDAL, MIRIAM SOLOMON, TEMPLE UNIVERSITY BOARD OF TRUSTEES, DAVID WOLFSDORF, filed by ATINA KNOWLES. (NO FEE PAID; NO IFP FILED) (Attachments: #1 Designation Form, #2 Exhibit EMAIL)(bw, ) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL-EPISCOPAL CAMPUS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NEIL J. HAMBURG