This case was last updated from PACER on 08/05/2019 at 08:14:00 (UTC).

Knowles v. D.O.C.R. et al

Case Summary

On 06/06/2019 Knowles filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against D O C R. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Dakota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Clare R. Hochhalter and Daniel L. Hovland. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00098

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Courthouse:

    North Dakota District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Clare R. Hochhalter

Presiding Judge

Daniel L. Hovland

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Efrain Reyes Knowles

Bismarck, ND 58502-1898

Defendants

Shaun Fode

Steve Bement

Dave Roggenbuck

Steve Foster

Lacy Zander

United States of America

Lacy Fischer

D.O.C.R.

Tyler Fleckenstein

Randy McGonigal

Colby Braun

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) JUDGMENT in favor of D.O.C.R., United States of America, Colby Braun, Dave Roggenbuck, Lacy Fischer, Lacy Zander, Randy McGonigal, Shaun Fode, Steve Bement, Steve Foster, Tyler Fleckenstein against Efrain Reyes Knowles by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland.(cjs) Distributed on 7/9/2019 (cjs). (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#11

(#11) ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland adopting #10 Report and Recommendations. (kmk) (Main Document 11 replaced on 7/9/2019 to correct order date) (cjs). NEF regenerated. Distributed on 7/9/2019 (cjs). (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#10

(#10) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #7 Complaint filed by Efrain Reyes Knowles. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG) Distributed on 6/24/2019 (cjs). (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#8

(#8) SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Efrain Reyes Knowles. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/1/2019. (cjs) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

7 #3

Inmate Grievance Form

7 #2

Waiver of Service

7 #1

NDDOCR Resident Handbook

#7

(#7) COMPLAINT against Steve Bement, Colby Braun, D.O.C.R., Lacy Fischer, Tyler Fleckenstein, Shaun Fode, Steve Foster, Randy McGonigal, Dave Roggenbuck, United States of America, Lacy Zander (IFP Granted) filed by Efrain Reyes Knowles. (Attachments: #1 NDDOCR Resident Handbook, #2 Waiver of Service, #3 Inmate Grievance Form)(cjs) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF COLLECTION OF FILING FEE sent to NDDOCR and Efrain Knowles re #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (cjs) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (BG) Distributed on 6/19/2019 (cjs). (Entered: 06/19/2019)

4 #1

Mailing Envelope

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Inmate Grievance Form by Efrain Reyes Knowles re #2 PLRA Packet. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(js) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

2 #2

Waiver of Service of Summons - Colby Braun

2 #1

ND DOCR Resident Handbook

#2

(#2) PLRA Packet. (Attachments: #1 ND DOCR Resident Handbook, #2 Waiver of Service of Summons - Colby Braun)(as) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

1 #2

Mailing Envelope

1 #1

Certificate of Inmate Account

#1

(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Efrain Reyes Knowles. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Inmate Account, #2 Mailing Envelope)(as) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) JUDGMENT in favor of D.O.C.R., United States of America, Colby Braun, Dave Roggenbuck, Lacy Fischer, Lacy Zander, Randy McGonigal, Shaun Fode, Steve Bement, Steve Foster, Tyler Fleckenstein against Efrain Reyes Knowles by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland.(cjs) Distributed on 7/9/2019 (cjs). (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland adopting #10 Report and Recommendations. (kmk) (Main Document 11 replaced on 7/9/2019 to correct order date) (cjs). NEF regenerated. Distributed on 7/9/2019 (cjs). (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #7 Complaint filed by Efrain Reyes Knowles. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG) Distributed on 6/24/2019 (cjs). (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • (#9) (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, as referral judge, for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer assigned to the case, as presiding judge. (kmk) Distributed on 6/24/2019 (cjs). Modified on 6/24/2019 to correct text (kmk). (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Efrain Reyes Knowles. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/1/2019. (cjs) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) COMPLAINT against Steve Bement, Colby Braun, D.O.C.R., Lacy Fischer, Tyler Fleckenstein, Shaun Fode, Steve Foster, Randy McGonigal, Dave Roggenbuck, United States of America, Lacy Zander (IFP Granted) filed by Efrain Reyes Knowles. (Attachments: #1 NDDOCR Resident Handbook, #2 Waiver of Service, #3 Inmate Grievance Form)(cjs) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF COLLECTION OF FILING FEE sent to NDDOCR and Efrain Knowles re #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (cjs) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (BG) Distributed on 6/19/2019 (cjs). (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Inmate Grievance Form by Efrain Reyes Knowles re #2 PLRA Packet. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(js) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Efrain Reyes Knowles. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/21/2019. (as) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PLRA Packet. (Attachments: #1 ND DOCR Resident Handbook, #2 Waiver of Service of Summons - Colby Braun)(as) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Efrain Reyes Knowles. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Inmate Account, #2 Mailing Envelope)(as) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where D.O.C.R. is a litigant