This case was last updated from PACER on 07/22/2019 at 08:22:29 (UTC).

Knowles v. D.O.C.R. et al

Case Summary

On 05/23/2019 Knowles filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against D O C R. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Dakota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Clare R. Hochhalter and Daniel L. Hovland. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00086

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    North Dakota District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Clare R. Hochhalter

Presiding Judge

Daniel L. Hovland

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Efrain Reyes Knowles

Bismarck, ND 58502

Defendants

D.O.C.R.

United States of America

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) JUDGMENT in favor of D.O.C.R., United States of America against Efrain Reyes Knowles by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland.(cjs) Distributed on 7/9/2019 (cjs). (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#12

(#12) ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland adopting #11 Report and Recommendations. (kmk) Distributed on 7/9/2019 (cjs). (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#11

(#11) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #8 Complaint filed by Efrain Reyes Knowles. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG) Distributed on 6/24/2019 (cjs). (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF COLLECTION OF FILING FEE sent to North Dakota State Penitentiary re #7 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (am) Distributed on 6/20/2019(am). (Entered: 06/20/2019)

8 #2

Mailing Envelope

8 #1

Miscellaneous Attachments

#8

(#8) COMPLAINT against D.O.C.R., United States of America filed by Efrain Reyes Knowles. (Attachments: #1 Miscellaneous Attachments, #2 Mailing Envelopes)(am) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (BG) (Main Document 7 replaced on 6/20/2019 to correct typographical error.) (am). NEF regenerated and distributed on 6/20/2019 (am). (Entered: 06/20/2019)

6 #1

Mailing Envelope

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Inmate Grievances and DOCR Response by Efrain Reyes Knowles. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(js) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

5 #2

Mailing Envelope

5 #1

Duplicate Certificate of Inmate Accounts

#5

(#5) NOTICE (Inmate Request to Facility for Certificate of Inmate Accounts) by Efrain Reyes Knowles re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Duplicate Certificate of Inmate Accounts, #2 Mailing Envelope). NOTE: Duplicate copy of Certificate received by the Clerk's Office after original certificate received at docket #2 .(js) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Efrain Reyes Knowles. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/24/2019. (js) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

3 #1

Exhibits - Positive Behavior Reports & Inmate Grievance Reports

#3

(#3) PLRA Packet. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits - Positive Behavior Reports & Inmate Grievance Reports, #2 Mailing Envelopes)(js) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

2 #1

Certificate of Inmate Account and Assets

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Efrain Reyes Knowles. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Inmate Account and Assets)(js) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) JUDGMENT in favor of D.O.C.R., United States of America against Efrain Reyes Knowles by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland.(cjs) Distributed on 7/9/2019 (cjs). (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland adopting #11 Report and Recommendations. (kmk) Distributed on 7/9/2019 (cjs). (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #8 Complaint filed by Efrain Reyes Knowles. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG) Distributed on 6/24/2019 (cjs). (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • (#10) (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, as referral judge, for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer assigned to the case, as presiding judge. (kmk) Distributed on 6/24/2019 (cjs). Modified on 6/24/2019 to correct text (kmk). (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF COLLECTION OF FILING FEE sent to North Dakota State Penitentiary re #7 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (am) Distributed on 6/20/2019(am). (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) COMPLAINT against D.O.C.R., United States of America filed by Efrain Reyes Knowles. (Attachments: #1 Miscellaneous Attachments, #2 Mailing Envelopes)(am) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (BG) (Main Document 7 replaced on 6/20/2019 to correct typographical error.) (am). NEF regenerated and distributed on 6/20/2019 (am). (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Inmate Grievances and DOCR Response by Efrain Reyes Knowles. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(js) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE (Inmate Request to Facility for Certificate of Inmate Accounts) by Efrain Reyes Knowles re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Duplicate Certificate of Inmate Accounts, #2 Mailing Envelope). NOTE: Duplicate copy of Certificate received by the Clerk's Office after original certificate received at docket #2 .(js) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Efrain Reyes Knowles. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/24/2019. (js) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PLRA Packet. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits - Positive Behavior Reports & Inmate Grievance Reports, #2 Mailing Envelopes)(js) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Efrain Reyes Knowles. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Inmate Account and Assets)(js) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Remark: PRISONER LITIGATION PACKET received incomplete. Request to complete PLRA packet sent to inmate. (as) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where D.O.C.R. is a litigant