This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/24/2021 at 09:49:23 (UTC).

Know How, LLC v. Federated Mutual Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 03/25/2021 Know How, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Federated Mutual Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nebraska District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph F. Bataillon and Cheryl R. Zwart. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-00130

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph F. Bataillon

Referral Judge

Cheryl R. Zwart

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Know How, LLC doing business as Frank's Parts

Defendant

Federated Mutual Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Justin B. Demerath

Attorney at O'HANLON, MCCOLLOM LAW FIRM

808 West Avenue

Austin, TX 78701

Robert D. Green

Attorney at GREEN KLEIN LAW FIRM

440 Louisiana Street, Suite 1900

Houston, TX 77002

Larry R. Demerath

Attorney at DEMERATH LAW FIRM

12829 West Dodge Road, Suite 201

Omaha, NE 68154-2188

William T. Jones, Jr.

Attorney at GREEN KLEIN LAW FIRM

440 Louisiana Street, Suite 1900

Houston, TX 77002

Hunter M. Klein

Attorney at GREEN KLEIN LAW FIRM

440 Louisiana Street, Suite 1900

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant Attorneys

Julie A. Jorgensen

Attorney at MORROW, WILLNAUER LAW FIRM - NEBRASKA

1299 Farnam Street, Suite 900

Omaha, NE 68131

James C. Morrow

Attorney at MORROW, WILLNAUER LAW FIRM - KANSAS CITY

8330 Ward Parkway, Suite 300, Executive Hills East

Kansas City, MO 64114

Zacarias R. Chacon

Attorney at LEWIS, BRISBOIS LAW FIRM - CHICAGO

550 West Adams Street, Suite 300

Chicago, IL 60661

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit Complaint - State Court

1 #2

Exhibit Notice to State Court

#3

#4

#5

#8

#10

#11

#12

#14

#15

#16

#17

RESTRICTED

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 6/4/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ANSWER to Complaint by Federated Mutual Insurance Company (Chacon, Zacarias) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Zacarias R. Chacon on behalf of Defendant Federated Mutual Insurance Company (Chacon, Zacarias) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #12 for attorney Zacarias R. Chacon. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4387121 by Attorney Zacarias R. Chacon on behalf of Defendant Federated Mutual Insurance Company.(Chacon, Zacarias) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Robert D. Green on behalf of Plaintiff Know How, LLC.(Green, Robert) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Julie A. Jorgensen on behalf of Defendant Federated Mutual Insurance Company.(Jorgensen, Julie) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) TEXT ORDER granting #8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. The deadline for Defendant to answer or respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is May 3, 2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JLK) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Julie A. Jorgensen on behalf of Defendant Federated Mutual Insurance Company.(Jorgensen, Julie) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • Docket(#7) TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Federated Mutual Insurance Company. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • Docket(#6) TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Know How, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Hunter M. Klein has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney William T. Jones, Jr. has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Robert D. Green has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • Docket(#2) TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against Know How, LLC d/b/a Frank's Parts from District Court of Scotts Bluff County, Nebraska, Case number CI 21-141 ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4366429) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Julie A. Jorgensen on behalf of Federated Mutual Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint - State Court, #2 Exhibit Notice to State Court)(Jorgensen, Julie) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FEDERATED MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Justin B. Demerath(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hunter M. Klein

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William T Jones, Jr