This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/17/2019 at 07:40:09 (UTC).

Knotts v. Schneider National Bulk Carriers Inc

Case Summary

On 10/18/2019 Knotts filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Schneider National Bulk Carriers Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee H Rosenthal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-04087

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lee H Rosenthal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joseph A. Knotts

Houston, TX 77008

Defendants

Schneider National Bulk Carriers Inc

Dylan McKenzie Guerin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brent Michael Cordell

Attorney at Smith & Hassler

1225 N Loop W, Ste 525

Houston, TX 77008

Defendant Attorney

Howard Mark Burck

Attorney at Hanszen Laporte LLP

14201 Memorial Drive

Houston, TX 77079

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #5

Exhibit E

#2

#3

3 #1

Supplement

#4

#5

5 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling & DCO

#6

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses by Schneider National Bulk Carriers Inc, filed. (Burck, Howard) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Agreed JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Schneider National Bulk Carriers Inc, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling & DCO)(Burck, Howard) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 1/14/2020 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Supplement) Parties notified.(leddins, 4) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Schneider National Bulk Carriers Inc, filed.(Burck, Howard) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 129th District Court, case number 2019-72243 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23392840) filed by Schneider National Bulk Carriers Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Burck, Howard) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Schneider National Bulk Carriers, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer H Mark Burck