This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/11/2021 at 09:31:21 (UTC).

Knight v. Robinson

Case Summary

On 11/12/2020 Knight filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Robinson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is S. Kato Crews. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03365

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

S. Kato Crews

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David Knight

Defendant

Kelvin Robinson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Deana R. Dagner

Attorney at Dagner Schluter Mitzner Werber LLC

8400 East Prentice Avenue, Suite 1401

Greenwood Village, CO 80111

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) CERTIFICATE of Service by E-Mail by Clerk of Court re #10 Order on Motion to Withdraw Document to Marizela.cano@judicial.stat.co.us. (jgonz, ) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion to Withdraw Notice of Removal. This civil action is REMANDED to Boulder County District Court, by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 11/23/2020.(jgonz, ) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

9 #1

Proposed Order (PDF Only)

#9

(#9) MOTION to Withdraw Document re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Kelvin Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Dagner, Deana) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Withdraw Document re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Kelvin Robinson. (Dagner, Deana) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

#6

(#6) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint, and Civil Cover Sheet upon Kelvin Robinson on 10/10/2020. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Kelvin Robinson, filed by David Knight.(jtorr, ) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kelvin Robinson from Boulder District Court, Case Number 2020CV30834. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7585071), filed by Kelvin Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Dagner, Deana) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE of Service by E-Mail by Clerk of Court re #10 Order on Motion to Withdraw Document to Marizela.cano@judicial.stat.co.us. (jgonz, ) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • Docket(#11) Civil Case Terminated pursuant to Order to Remand. Text Only Entry (jgonz, ) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion to Withdraw Notice of Removal. This civil action is REMANDED to Boulder County District Court, by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 11/23/2020.(jgonz, ) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Withdraw Document re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Kelvin Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Dagner, Deana) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Withdraw Document re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Kelvin Robinson. (Dagner, Deana) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • Docket(#7) Setting Telephonic Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. The Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 2-9-2021 at 9:30 am in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 2-9-2021. The Magistrate Judge Consent Form [#8] is due 2-9-2021. Dial in information for the Scheduling Conference is as follows:CONFERENCE CALL LINE: (888) 251-2909ACCESS CODE: 5662814# SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 11-13-2020. Text Only Entry (skclc2). (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint, and Civil Cover Sheet upon Kelvin Robinson on 10/10/2020. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Kelvin Robinson, filed by David Knight.(jtorr, ) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • Docket(#2) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, ) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kelvin Robinson from Boulder District Court, Case Number 2020CV30834. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7585071), filed by Kelvin Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Dagner, Deana) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Deana R. Dagner