This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/07/2020 at 08:13:03 (UTC).

Knight v. Gielchinsky et al

Case Summary

On 02/07/2020 Knight filed an Other lawsuit against Gielchinsky. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cecilia M. Altonaga and Jonathan Goodman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-20576

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cecilia M. Altonaga

Referral Judge

Jonathan Goodman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JEREMY I KNIGHT

Jeremy I. Knight

Defendants

JEFFREY J BURROS

DANIEL Y GIELCHINSKY

Jeffrey J. Burros

Daniel Y. Gielchinsky

Bay Harbor Islands, FL 33154

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shlomo Y Hecht

Attorney at Shlomo Y Hecht PA

3076 N Commerce Parkway

Miramar, FL 33025

Defendant Attorney

Daniel Gielchinsky

Attorney at Daniel Y. Gielchinsky, P.A.

1132 Kane Concourse, Suite 204

Bay Harbor Islands, FL 33154

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint ( Responses due by 4/13/2020) by Jeffrey J. Burros, Daniel Y. Gielchinsky. (Gielchinsky, Daniel) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

#22

(#22) SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 12/21/2020 before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga., Calendar Call set for 12/15/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation., ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 3/23/2020. See attached document for full details. (ls) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 03/23/2020)

#21

(#21) ORDER denying #19 Renewed Motion to Require Preservation of ESI and Enjoin further use of Laptop. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 3/23/2020. See attached document for full details. (ls) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

#20

(#20) Amended SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Jeremy I. Knight (Hecht, Shlomo) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

19 #2

Text of Proposed Order

19 #1

Affidavit Declaration of Jeffrey Burros

#19

(#19) Renewed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction enjoining further use of laptop at issue, Renewed MOTION to Preserve Evidence ESI by Jeffrey J. Burros, Daniel Y. Gielchinsky. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Jeffrey Burros, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gielchinsky, Daniel) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

#18

(#18) Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Jeffrey J. Burros, Daniel Y. Gielchinsky (Gielchinsky, Daniel) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

#17

(#17) ORDER denying #16 Motion Expedited Motion to Strike Purported Joint Scheduling Report, Require Preservation of ESI and Enjoin Further Use of Laptop. The Parties are directed to comply with the Courts Order [ECF No. 5] by March 20, 2020 and file a joint scheduling report, not a unilateral version improperly titled "Joint Scheduling Report." Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 3/19/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Jeremy I. Knight. Daniel Y. Gielchinsky served on 2/18/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. (Hecht, Shlomo) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER that Defendant Jeffrey J. Burros shall not file a response until all Defendants have been served. Once all Defendants have been served, Defendants shall submit a single combined response or separate answers within the time allowed for the last-served Defendant to respond. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 2/13/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

#5

(#5) Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties to be filed by 3/18/2020. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 2/13/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by JEREMY I KNIGHT. JEFFREY J BURROS served on 2/12/2020, answer due 3/4/2020. (Hecht, Shlomo) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to JEFFREY J BURROS, DANIEL Y GIELCHINSKY. (ar2) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

1 #3

Summon(s)

1 #2

Summon(s)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#23) MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint ( Responses due by 4/13/2020) by Jeffrey J. Burros, Daniel Y. Gielchinsky. (Gielchinsky, Daniel) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing on #23 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 4/24/2020 02:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (ps1) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint ( Responses due by 4/13/2020) by Jeffrey J. Burros, Daniel Y. Gielchinsky. (Gielchinsky, Daniel) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 12/21/2020 before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga., Calendar Call set for 12/15/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation., ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 3/23/2020. See attached document for full details. (ls) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER denying #19 Renewed Motion to Require Preservation of ESI and Enjoin further use of Laptop. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 3/23/2020. See attached document for full details. (ls) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Amended SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Jeremy I. Knight (Hecht, Shlomo) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Renewed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction enjoining further use of laptop at issue, Renewed MOTION to Preserve Evidence ESI by Jeffrey J. Burros, Daniel Y. Gielchinsky. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Jeffrey Burros, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gielchinsky, Daniel) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Jeffrey J. Burros, Daniel Y. Gielchinsky (Gielchinsky, Daniel) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER denying #16 Motion Expedited Motion to Strike Purported Joint Scheduling Report, Require Preservation of ESI and Enjoin Further Use of Laptop. The Parties are directed to comply with the Courts Order [ECF No. 5] by March 20, 2020 and file a joint scheduling report, not a unilateral version improperly titled "Joint Scheduling Report." Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 3/19/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to Strike #14 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f)/16.1 ( Responses due by 4/2/2020), MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , MOTION to Preserve Evidence Expedited Relief Requested by Jeffrey J. Burros, Daniel Y. Gielchinsky. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gielchinsky, Daniel) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Jeremy I. Knight (Hecht, Shlomo) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PAPERLESS ORDER deferring ruling on #9 Motion for Extension of Time; denying #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer due to the failure to submit a proposed order, as is required by the Local Rules. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (CMA) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint re #1 Complaint ( Responses due by 3/23/2020), MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Jeffrey J. Burros, Daniel Y. Gielchinsky. (Gielchinsky, Daniel) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel Gielchinsky on behalf of Jeffrey J. Burros, Daniel Y. Gielchinsky. Attorney Daniel Gielchinsky added to party Jeffrey J. Burros(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Gielchinsky added to party Daniel Y. Gielchinsky(pty:dft). (Gielchinsky, Daniel) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Jeremy I. Knight. Daniel Y. Gielchinsky served on 2/18/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. (Hecht, Shlomo) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER that Defendant Jeffrey J. Burros shall not file a response until all Defendants have been served. Once all Defendants have been served, Defendants shall submit a single combined response or separate answers within the time allowed for the last-served Defendant to respond. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 2/13/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties to be filed by 3/18/2020. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 2/13/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by JEREMY I KNIGHT. JEFFREY J BURROS served on 2/12/2020, answer due 3/4/2020. (Hecht, Shlomo) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to JEFFREY J BURROS, DANIEL Y GIELCHINSKY. (ar2) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against JEFFREY J BURROS, DANIEL Y GIELCHINSKY. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12418726, filed by JEREMY I KNIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s))(Hecht, Shlomo) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel Gielchinsky