This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/07/2023 at 09:27:05 (UTC).

Knight v. Americold Logistics, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/06/2023 Knight filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Americold Logistics, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are William T. Moore, Jr and Christopher L. Ray. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:23-CV-00006

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William T. Moore, Jr

Referral Judge

Christopher L. Ray

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jacquelyn K. Knight

Defendant

Americold Logistics, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Adeash Lakraj

Defendant Attorneys

John Lauchlin Monroe, Jr.

Alyce B. Ogunsola

Charles W. Hoffman

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 4/18/2023; Discovery due by 8/15/2023; Motions due by 9/14/2023; Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 5/18/2023; Expert Witness Report (Defendant) due by 6/17/2023; and Status Report due by 8/29/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 02/21/2023. (jlh) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

#22

(#22) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Lakraj, Adeash) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

#21

(#21) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Americold Logistics, LLC. (Ogunsola, Alyce) (Entered: 02/06/2023)

#20

(#20) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Americold Logistics, LLC identifying Americold Logistics, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (Ogunsola, Alyce) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

#19

(#19) ANSWER to Complaint by Americold Logistics, LLC.(Ogunsola, Alyce) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

#18

(#18) ORDER granting re #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Charles W. Hoffman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 2/3/23. (loh) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

#17

(#17) ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John L. Monroe, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 2/2/2023. (gmh) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

#13

(#17) ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John L. Monroe, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 2/2/2023. (gmh) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

#11

(#16) NOTICE of Filing by Americold Logistics, LLC re #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Charles X. Hoffman Receipt Number AGASDC-3516334, Fee Amount $200, Charles W. Hoffman's List of Prior Pro Hac Vice Cases (Ogunsola, Alyce) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

9 #1

Text of Proposed Order For Leave of Absence

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re: 7 Notice. After 14 days a notice of noncompliance will be submitted to a judicial officer for possible sanctions, to include dismissal. Compliance due by 2/1/2023. (csr) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint and Litigants Bill of Rights served on Americold Logistics, LLC on 01/12/2023, filed by Jacquelyn K. Knight. (Lakraj, Adeash) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

#5

(#5) Litigants' Bill of Rights by Jacquelyn K. Knight. (Lakraj, Adeash) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

4 #1

Notice

4 #4

Main Document

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Americold Logistics, LLC. (wwp) Modified on 1/9/2023 (csr). (Entered: 01/06/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 4/18/2023; Discovery due by 8/15/2023; Motions due by 9/14/2023; Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 5/18/2023; Expert Witness Report (Defendant) due by 6/17/2023; and Status Report due by 8/29/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 02/21/2023. (jlh) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED: #22 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (csr) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Lakraj, Adeash) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Americold Logistics, LLC. (Ogunsola, Alyce) (Entered: 02/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Americold Logistics, LLC identifying Americold Logistics, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (Ogunsola, Alyce) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ANSWER to Complaint by Americold Logistics, LLC.(Ogunsola, Alyce) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER granting re #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Charles W. Hoffman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 2/3/23. (loh) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John L. Monroe, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 2/2/2023. (gmh) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED: #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Charles X. Hoffman Receipt Number AGASDC-3516334, Fee Amount $200. (csr) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Filing by Americold Logistics, LLC re #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Charles X. Hoffman Receipt Number AGASDC-3516334, Fee Amount $200, Charles W. Hoffman's List of Prior Pro Hac Vice Cases (Ogunsola, Alyce) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED: #9 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Jacquelyn K. Knight for dates of: February 17, 2023 through February 19, 2023; March 22, 2023 through March 27, 2023 and June 12, 2023 through June 23, 2023. (csr) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Jacquelyn K. Knight for dates of : February 17, 2023 through February 19, 2023; March 22, 2023 through March 27, 2023 and June 12, 2023 through June 23, 2023 by Jacquelyn K. Knight. Responses due by 2/15/2023. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order For Leave of Absence)(Lakraj, Adeash) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re: 7 Notice. After 14 days a notice of noncompliance will be submitted to a judicial officer for possible sanctions, to include dismissal. Compliance due by 2/1/2023. (csr) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint and Litigants Bill of Rights served on Americold Logistics, LLC on 01/12/2023, filed by Jacquelyn K. Knight. (Lakraj, Adeash) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Litigants' Bill of Rights by Jacquelyn K. Knight. (Lakraj, Adeash) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 26(f)ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 1/6/23. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (wwp) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • Docket(#3) Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (wwp) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Americold Logistics, LLC. (wwp) Modified on 1/9/2023 (csr). (Entered: 01/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketFiling fee: $ 402.00, receipt number AGASDC - 3498562. (wwp) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Americold Logistics, LLC, filed by Jacquelyn K. Knight. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wwp) Modified on 1/9/2023 (csr). (Entered: 01/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less