This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/04/2023 at 07:41:17 (UTC).

Knight et al v. State Farm Automobile Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 01/03/2023 Knight filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Automobile Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John L. Kane and Michael E. Hegarty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00007

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John L. Kane

Referral Judge

Michael E. Hegarty

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Constance Knight

Roger Knight

Defendant

State Farm Automobile Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nicholas Douglas Vincent Stofa

Attorney at Falgien Warr & Iyer, P.C.

4251 Kipling Street, Suite 525

Wheat Ridge, CO 80033

Defendant Attorney

Heather A. Salg

Attorney at Messner Reeves LLP

6465 Greenwood Plaza Boulevard, Suite 650

Greenwood Village, CO 80111

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 21 February 2023. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

#21

(#21) COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Scheduling Conference held on 2/21/2023.FTR: A501. (cthom, ) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

#20

(#20) Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant State Farm Automobile Insurance Company. (Salg, Heather) (Entered: 02/09/2023)

#19

(#19) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7 February 2023. Before the Court is the parties' Motion to Allow Both Counsel to Appear to Scheduling Conference by Phone. The Motion #12 is granted. Counsel for both parties may appear remotely at the Scheduling Conference set for February 21, 2023 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street in Denver, Colorado. Counsel for both parties may call the courtroom's conference line at: Number: 888-278-0296 Access code: 8212991#.(cmadr, ) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

#18

(#18) DESIGNATION OF NON-PARTY by Defendant State Farm Automobile Insurance Company. (Salg, Heather) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

#16

(#16) ORDER of Reference to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Judge John L. Kane on 2/6/2023. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-00007-JLK-MEH. (angar, ) (Entered: 02/06/2023)

#14

(#14) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 02/06/2023. Pursuant to the consent form filed by the parties declining consent under D.C.Colo.LCivR 40.1(c) (ECF 13), the Court directs the Clerk of the Court to reassign this case under D.C.Colo.LCivR 40.1(a). This Court may continue on the case to hear matters referred by the district judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(b), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72 and D.C.Colo.LCivR 72.1(c) re: #13 Consent/Non-Consent Form to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge filed by State Farm Automobile Insurance Company. (alave, ) (Entered: 02/06/2023)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Salg, Heather) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

1 #9

Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet USDC Civil Case Cover Sheet

1 #7

Exhibit Exhibit G - ROS

1 #6

Exhibit Exhibit F - Register of Actions

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibit E - Articles of Incorporation

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit D - State Court Notice

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C - District Court Summons

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint

1 #1

Main Document

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 21 February 2023. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Scheduling Conference held on 2/21/2023.FTR: A501. (cthom, ) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant State Farm Automobile Insurance Company. (Salg, Heather) (Entered: 02/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7 February 2023. Before the Court is the parties' Motion to Allow Both Counsel to Appear to Scheduling Conference by Phone. The Motion #12 is granted. Counsel for both parties may appear remotely at the Scheduling Conference set for February 21, 2023 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street in Denver, Colorado. Counsel for both parties may call the courtroom's conference line at: Number: 888-278-0296 Access code: 8212991#.(cmadr, ) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) DESIGNATION OF NON-PARTY by Defendant State Farm Automobile Insurance Company. (Salg, Heather) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • Docket(#17) MEMORANDUM regarding #12 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear to Scheduling Conference Remotely filed by State Farm Automobile Insurance Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge John L. Kane on 2/6/2023. Text Only Entry (jlksec) (Entered: 02/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER of Reference to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Judge John L. Kane on 2/6/2023. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-00007-JLK-MEH. (angar, ) (Entered: 02/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #14 Minute Order. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge John L. Kane. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-00007-JLK. (Text Only Entry). (alave, ) (Entered: 02/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 02/06/2023. Pursuant to the consent form filed by the parties declining consent under D.C.Colo.LCivR 40.1(c) (ECF 13), the Court directs the Clerk of the Court to reassign this case under D.C.Colo.LCivR 40.1(a). This Court may continue on the case to hear matters referred by the district judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(b), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72 and D.C.Colo.LCivR 72.1(c) re: #13 Consent/Non-Consent Form to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge filed by State Farm Automobile Insurance Company. (alave, ) (Entered: 02/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • Docket(#13) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant State Farm Automobile Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Salg, Heather) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #8 by Defendant State Farm Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Salg, Heather) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance for Brianne N. Falgien, Vinod K. Iyer, and Nicholas D. Stofa by Nicholas Douglas Vincent Stofa on behalf of Constance Knight, Roger KnightAttorney Nicholas Douglas Vincent Stofa added to party Constance Knight(pty:pla), Attorney Nicholas Douglas Vincent Stofa added to party Roger Knight(pty:pla) (Stofa, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DISCHARGED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4 January 2023. It is ORDERED that Defendant file a written response to this Order to Show Cause on or before January 18, 2023, demonstrating why the Court should not remand this case (or recommend that it be remanded) for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (cmadr, ) Modified pursuant to ECF #11 on 1/12/2023 (cmadr, ). (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (norlin, ) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • Docket(#6) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (norlin, ) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against State Farm Automobile Insurance Company, filed by Constance Knight, Roger Knight.(norlin, ) Modified on 1/4/2023 to correct date (norlin, ). (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • Docket(#4) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (norlin, ) Modified on 1/4/2023 to correct date (norlin, ). (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint by State Farm Automobile Insurance Company.(Salg, Heather) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Salg, Heather) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Automobile Insurance Company from Denver District Court, Case Number 2022CV33533. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-8862373), filed by State Farm Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Civil Case Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - District Court Summons, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - State Court Notice, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Articles of Incorporation, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Register of Actions, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G - ROS, #8 Civil Cover Sheet USDC Civil Case Cover Sheet, #9 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Salg, Heather) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less