This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 05:27:23 (UTC).

Knight-Brown et al v. United States of America et al

Case Summary

On 03/20/2019 Knight-Brown filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kimberly E. West. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-00093

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kimberly E. West

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Justin Len Brown

Miranda Knight-Brown

Defendants

Jason Hill

John Does 1-30

United States of America

William Hayes

United States Department of Health and Human Services

Choctaw Nation Healthcare Services Authority

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

A. Laurie Koller

Attorney at Koller Trial Law, PLLC

320 S Boston, Ste 1130

Tulsa, OK 74103

E. Anthony Mareshie

Po Box 330161

Tulsa, OK 74133-0161

Defendant Attorneys

Patricia A. Sawyer

Attorney at Whitten Burrage

512 N Broadway, Ste 300

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

J. Renley Dennis

Attorney at Whitten Burrage

512 N Broadway, Ste 300

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Michael Burrage

Attorney at Whitten Burrage

512 N Broadway, Ste 300

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

20 #3

Exhibit 3-Complaint

20 #2

Exhibit 2-Choctaw Nation Conditions of Employment

20 #1

Exhibit 1-Hearing and Appellate Review

#20

(#20) RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim ) by Justin Len Brown, Miranda Knight-Brown ; (With attachments)(Mareshie, E.) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

14 #4

Exhibit 4 - 82 Fed Reg 4915

14 #3

Exhibit 3 - Attachment 1 to Compact

14 #2

Exhibit 2 - Compact

14 #1

Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Chief Batton

#14

(#14) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim by Choctaw Nation Healthcare Services Authority, William Hayes, Jason Hill (With attachments) Responses due by 7/5/2019(Burrage, Michael) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to William Hayes (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Jason Hill (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Choctaw Nation Healthcare Services Authority (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to United States Department of Health and Human Services (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

#3

(#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party (Filing Fee due by 3/27/2019) (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

2 #2

Exhibit 2 - FICA Claim Denial

2 #1

Exhibit 1 - FICA Notice of Claim

#2

FILING FEES Paid in Full on 3/20/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number 1086-1252631 (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by Justin Len Brown, Miranda Knight-Brown (Koller, A.) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Justin Len Brown, Miranda Knight-Brown (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2019
  • (#21) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West resetting hearing(s): Telephonic Scheduling Conference reset for 8/2/2019 10:30 AM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. The Court will initiate the conference call. (adw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim ) by Justin Len Brown, Miranda Knight-Brown ; (With attachments)(Mareshie, E.) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: United States of America - Served on 6/21/2019. by Miranda Knight-Brown; Justin Len Brown (With attachments)(Koller, A.) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: United States Department of Health and Human Services - Served on 6/3/2019. by Miranda Knight-Brown; Justin Len Brown (With attachments)(Koller, A.) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Jason Hill - Served on 5/30/2019. by Miranda Knight-Brown; Justin Len Brown (With attachments)(Koller, A.) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: William Hayes - Served on 5/29/2019. by Miranda Knight-Brown; Justin Len Brown (With attachments)(Koller, A.) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Choctaw Nation Healthcare Services Authority - Served on 5/30/2019. by Miranda Knight-Brown; Justin Len Brown (With attachments)(Koller, A.) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim by Choctaw Nation Healthcare Services Authority, William Hayes, Jason Hill (With attachments) Responses due by 7/5/2019(Burrage, Michael) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael Burrage on behalf of Choctaw Nation Healthcare Services Authority, William Hayes, Jason Hill (Burrage, Michael) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by J. Renley Dennis on behalf of Choctaw Nation Healthcare Services Authority, William Hayes, Jason Hill (Dennis, J.) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to United States of America (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by E. Anthony Mareshie on behalf of Justin Len Brown, Miranda Knight-Brown (Mareshie, E.) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to William Hayes (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Jason Hill (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Choctaw Nation Healthcare Services Authority (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to United States Department of Health and Human Services (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FILING FEES Paid in Full on 3/20/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number 1086-1252631 (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by Justin Len Brown, Miranda Knight-Brown (Koller, A.) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party (Filing Fee due by 3/27/2019) (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Choctaw Nation Healthcare Services Authority, John Does 1-30, William Hayes, Jason Hill, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States of America by Miranda Knight-Brown, Justin Len Brown (With attachments) (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Justin Len Brown, Miranda Knight-Brown (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.