This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/23/2021 at 13:09:09 (UTC).

KNESS vs. W.R. CASE & SONS CUTLERY et al

Case Summary

On 11/24/2020 KNESS filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against W R CASE SONS CUTLERY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan Paradise Baxter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00334

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan Paradise Baxter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MISTY KNESS

Defendants

W.R. CASE & SONS CUTLERY

ZIPPO MANUFACTURING COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Emily E. Town

Attorney at Rothman Gordon

310 Grant Street, Third Floor, Grant Building

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MISTY KNESS. ZIPPO MANUFACTURING COMPANY waiver sent on 11/25/2020, answer due 1/25/2021. (Town, Emily) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MISTY KNESS. W.R. CASE & SONS CUTLERY waiver sent on 11/25/2020, answer due 1/25/2021. (Town, Emily) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

2 #1

Summons issued as to Zippo Manufacturing Company

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to W.R. CASE & SONS CUTLERY (main document), ZIPPO MANUFACTURING COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Summons issued as to Zippo Manufacturing Company) (jv) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against W.R. CASE & SONS CUTLERY, ZIPPO MANUFACTURING COMPANY (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-6109290), filed by MISTY KNESS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jv) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MISTY KNESS. ZIPPO MANUFACTURING COMPANY waiver sent on 11/25/2020, answer due 1/25/2021. (Town, Emily) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MISTY KNESS. W.R. CASE & SONS CUTLERY waiver sent on 11/25/2020, answer due 1/25/2021. (Town, Emily) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to W.R. CASE & SONS CUTLERY (main document), ZIPPO MANUFACTURING COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Summons issued as to Zippo Manufacturing Company) (jv) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against W.R. CASE & SONS CUTLERY, ZIPPO MANUFACTURING COMPANY (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-6109290), filed by MISTY KNESS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jv) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Zippo Manufacturing Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Emily E. Town Esq.