This case was last updated from PACER on 08/29/2021 at 09:45:00 (UTC).

K.Mizra LLC v. Verizon Communications Inc. et al

Case Summary

On June 30, 2021, K. Mizra LLC (“K. Mizra” or “Plaintiff”), represented by Andrea Leigh Fair and Claire Abernathy Henry of Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Verizon Communications Inc., Cellco Partnership D/B/A Verizon Wireless, Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc., and Verizon Online LLC (collectively, “Verizon” or “Defendants”), seeking damages along with pre- and post-judgement interests among other reliefs for alleged infringement of the United States patents owned by the Plaintiff. This case was filed in the United States District Court in the Eastern District of Texas with Judge Rodney Gilstrap presiding. 

 

The Plaintiff filed the complaint for the alleged infringement of the United States Patent No. 8,958,819 entitled “Femto-Assisted Location Estimation in Macro-Femto Heterogeneous Networks” (the “`819 Patent” or “the Patent-in-Suit”) owned by the Plaintiff.

 

In the complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that, “K. Mizra is the owner of all right, title and interest in and to the `819 Patent with the full and exclusive right to bring suit to enforce the `819 Patent” and “Verizon has infringed and continues to infringe, either literally or under the doctrine of equivalents, one or more claims, including at least claim 30 of the `819 Patent in violation of 35 U.S.C. §§ 271 et seq.”

 

The Plaintiff also alleged that, “Verizon has infringed and continues to infringe, either literally or under the doctrine of equivalents, one or more claims, including at least claim 30 of the `819 Patent in violation of 35 U.S.C. §§ 271 et seq. by determining location information of mobile devices on its cellular network through the utilization of its location server equipment and software that operate in accordance with its mobile positioning algorithms including certain aspects of cellular industry standards promulgated by the 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP) and Open Mobile Alliance (OMA).”

 

Further, the Plaintiff alleged that, “Verizon has notice that it infringes at least claim 30 of the `819 Patent at least as of the service of this complaint” and “As a result of Verizon’s infringement of the `819 Patent, K. Mizra has suffered and continues to suffer substantial injury and is entitled to recover all damages caused by Verizon’s infringement to the fullest extent permitted by the Patent Act, together with prejudgment interest and costs for Verizon’s wrongful conduct.”

 

There is only claim for relief laid down by the Plaintiff, for the alleged infringement of ’819 patent under 35 U.S.C. § 271.

 

In the prayer for relief, the Plaintiff has requested the Court for declaration that Defendants have infringed the patent, award monetary damages to compensate for the infringement of the Patent-in-suit pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 284, including costs and pre- and post-judgment interest. The Plaintiff also requested the Court for accounting and/or supplemental damages for all damages occurring after any discovery cutoff and through the Court’s entry of final judgment and costs and attorneys’ fees under 35 U.S.C. § 285 and any other relief the Court deems just and proper. 

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.



Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00243

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

K.Mizra LLC

Defendants

Verizon Communications Inc.

Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless

Verizon Online LLC

Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrea Leigh Fair

Attorney at Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC

1507 Bill Owens Parkway

Longview, TX 75604

Claire Abernathy Henry

Attorney at Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC

1507 Bill Owens Parkway

Longview, TX 75604

Cristofer Ivan Leffler

Attorney at Folio Law Group, PLLC

14512 Edgewater Ln Ne

Lake Forest Park, WA 98155

Cliff Win, Jr.

Attorney at Folio Law Group, PLLC

14512 Edgewater Ln Ne

Lake Forest Park, WA 98155

Joseph Michael Abraham

Attorney at Law Office of Joseph M. Abraham, PLLC

13492 Research Blvd., Ste 120, No. 177

Austin, TX 78750

Steven Thomas Skelley

Attorney at Folio Law Group, PLLC

14512 Edgewater Ln Ne

Lake Forest Park, WA 98155

Defendant Attorney

Michael E Jones

Attorney at Potter Minton, a Professional Corporation

110 North College Avenue, Suite 500

Tyler, TX 75702

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) CONSOLIDATION ORDER - The above-captioned case is hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues with the LEAD CASE, Case No. 2:21-cv-00241. All parties are instructed to file any future filings in the LEAD CASE. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/24/2021. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

#20

(#20) SUMMONS Returned Executed by K.Mizra LLC. Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless served on 8/2/2021, answer due 9/23/2021. (Fair, Andrea) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

#18

(#18) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Verizon Online LLC.( Jones, Michael) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

#17

(#17) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc..( Jones, Michael) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

#15

No Description Available

#13

No Description Available

#12

No Description Available

#11

No Description Available

10 #3

Summons(es)

10 #2

Summons(es)

#9

No Description Available

#8

No Description Available

7 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#7

(#7) COMPLAINT against Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Verizon Communications Inc., Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc., Verizon Online LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8477819.), filed by K.Mizra LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-US Patent No. 8,958,819, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fair, Andrea) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by K.Mizra LLC (Fair, Andrea) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

#4

(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Fair, Andrea) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

#3

(#3) ***FILED IN ERROR***Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Fair, Andrea) Modified on 6/30/2021 (ch, ). (Entered: 06/30/2021)

16 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) CONSOLIDATION ORDER - The above-captioned case is hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues with the LEAD CASE, Case No. 2:21-cv-00241. All parties are instructed to file any future filings in the LEAD CASE. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/24/2021. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) SUMMONS Returned Executed by K.Mizra LLC. Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless served on 8/2/2021, answer due 9/23/2021. (Fair, Andrea) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless to 9/23/2021. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Verizon Online LLC to 9/16/2021. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc. to 9/16/2021. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Verizon Communications Inc. to 9/16/2021. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless.( Jones, Michael) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Verizon Online LLC.( Jones, Michael) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc..( Jones, Michael) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Verizon Communications Inc..( Jones, Michael) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2021
  • Docket***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE FILE THE CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Document # 3, AO-120 Patent Form. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, ) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) COMPLAINT against Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Verizon Communications Inc., Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc., Verizon Online LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8477819.), filed by K.Mizra LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-US Patent No. 8,958,819, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fair, Andrea) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claire Abernathy Henry on behalf of K.Mizra LLC (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by K.Mizra LLC (Fair, Andrea) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Fair, Andrea) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ***FILED IN ERROR***Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Fair, Andrea) Modified on 6/30/2021 (ch, ). (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by K.Mizra LLC. (Fair, Andrea) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Fair, Andrea) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where K.Mizra LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Verizon Online LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless is a litigant