This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/06/2021 at 10:23:51 (UTC).

K.Mizra LLC v. Fortinet, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/08/2021 K Mizra LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Fortinet, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00249

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

K.Mizra LLC

Defendant

Fortinet, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cristofer Ivan Leffler

Attorney at Folio Law Group, PLLC

14512 Edgewater Ln Ne

Lake Forest Park, WA 98155

Claire Abernathy Henry

Attorney at Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC

1507 Bill Owens Parkway

Longview, TX 75604

Cliff Win, Jr.

Attorney at Folio Law Group, PLLC

14512 Edgewater Ln Ne

Lake Forest Park, WA 98155

Joseph Michael Abraham

Attorney at Law Office of Joseph M. Abraham, PLLC

13492 Research Blvd., Ste 120, No. 177

Austin, TX 78750

Andrea Leigh Fair

Attorney at Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC

1507 Bill Owens Parkway

Longview, TX 75604

 

Court Documents

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #10

Exhibit I

1 #6

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

#1

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketScheduling Conference set for 9/29/2021 02:00 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CONSOLIDATION ORDER - The above-captioned case is hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues with the LEAD CASE, Case No. 2:21-cv-00247. All parties are instructed to file any future filings in the LEAD CASE. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/24/2021. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Fortinet, Inc. to 9/12/2021. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re K.Mizra LLC.( Fair, Andrea) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Fortinet, Inc. to 8/28/2021. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re K.Mizra LLC.( Fair, Andrea) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by K.Mizra LLC. Fortinet, Inc. served on 7/8/2021, answer due 7/29/2021. (Fair, Andrea) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph Michael Abraham on behalf of K.Mizra LLC (Abraham, Joseph) Modified on 7/8/2021 (klc, ). (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cristofer Ivan Leffler on behalf of K.Mizra LLC (Leffler, Cristofer) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cliff Win, Jr on behalf of K.Mizra LLC (Win, Cliff) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Issued as to Fortinet, Inc. r/a Corporation Service Company d/b/a CSC-Lawyers Incorporating Service Company. (nkl, ) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, ) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, ) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claire Abernathy Henry on behalf of K.Mizra LLC (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by K.Mizra LLC (Fair, Andrea) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by K.Mizra LLC. (Fair, Andrea) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Fair, Andrea) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Fortinet, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8485085.), filed by K.Mizra LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I)(Fair, Andrea) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where K.Mizra LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Fortinet, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph M. Abraham