This case was last updated from PACER on 01/10/2021 at 08:19:46 (UTC).

Klinger v. Geisinger Medical Center

Case Summary

On 11/11/2020 Klinger filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Geisinger Medical Center. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew W. Brann. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-02091

  • Filing Date:

    11/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Matthew W. Brann

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marcy Klinger

Defendant

Geisinger Medical Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Samuel Dion

Attorney at Dion & Goldberger

1845 Walnut Street, Suite 1199

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Geisinger Medical Center. Geisinger Medical Center waiver sent on 11/18/2020, answer due 1/19/2021. (Lashay, Jill) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marcy Klinger. Geisinger Medical Center served on 11/12/2020, answer due 12/3/2020. (Dion, Samuel) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

#3

(#3) Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/13/2020. (jr) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

2 #1

Summons Packet

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Geisinger Medical Center and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (nr) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Geisinger Medical Center ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 5337935), filed by Marcy Klinger. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nr) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Geisinger Medical Center. Geisinger Medical Center waiver sent on 11/18/2020, answer due 1/19/2021. (Lashay, Jill) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS Returned Executed dated updated/corrected: Geisinger Medical Center served on 11/13/2020, answer due 12/4/2020. (lg) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marcy Klinger. Geisinger Medical Center served on 11/12/2020, answer due 12/3/2020. (Dion, Samuel) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/13/2020. (jr) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Geisinger Medical Center and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (nr) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Geisinger Medical Center ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 5337935), filed by Marcy Klinger. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nr) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less