This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/02/2021 at 07:18:08 (UTC).

KLINE v. EDWARDS et al

Case Summary

On 09/03/2021 KLINE filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against EDWARDS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are LACEY A COLLIER and ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01003

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LACEY A COLLIER

Referral Judge

ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCOTT ALAN KLINE

Monticello, FL 32344

Defendants

DR EDWARDS

CHARLES MAIORANA

MARK S INCH

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by SCOTT ALAN KLINE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(Filing fee was not paid. 2 service copies filed.) (jcw) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

1 #1

Exhibits

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by SCOTT ALAN KLINE. (jcw) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The clerk of court is directed to assess Plaintiff an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $33.07 pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1). Plaintiff must pay the initial partial filing fee within thirty days (10/12/2021) of the date of this order. The clerk of court is directed to mail a copy of this order with the appropriate cover letter to the Florida Department of Corrections, 501 South Calhoun St., Tallahassee, FL 32399-2500, Attention: Agency Clerk. Fee status updated to in forma pauperis. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 9/9/2021. (jcw)(cc: DOC) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Change of Address by SCOTT ALAN KLINE (Address updated to Jefferson Correctional Institution, 1050 Big Joe Road, Monticello, Florida 32344) (jcw) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

#6

(#6) MOTION FOR WAIVER OR ABEYANCE OF PARTIAL FILING FEE by SCOTT ALAN KLINE. (jcw) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER entered on #6 MOTION FOR WAIVER OR ABEYANCE OF PARTIAL FILING FEE. Within thirty days (11/15/2021) of the date of this order, Plaintiff must file an inmate account statement showing the activity in his account from August 21, 2021, to the present. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 10/14/2021. (jcw) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Extension Time, by SCOTT ALAN KLINE. (alb) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Extend Time. Plaintiff has shown good cause for the extension; therefore, the deadline for him to file an inmate account statement showing the activity in his account from August 21, 2021, to October 14, 2021, is extended to DECEMBER 15, 2021. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 11/1/2021. (jmw) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #8 MOTION to Extend Time. Referred to ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. (alb) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Extension Time, by SCOTT ALAN KLINE. (alb) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER entered on #6 MOTION FOR WAIVER OR ABEYANCE OF PARTIAL FILING FEE. Within thirty days (11/15/2021) of the date of this order, Plaintiff must file an inmate account statement showing the activity in his account from August 21, 2021, to the present. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 10/14/2021. (jcw) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #6 MOTION FOR WAIVER OR ABEYANCE OF PARTIAL FILING FEE. Referred to ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. (jcw) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION FOR WAIVER OR ABEYANCE OF PARTIAL FILING FEE by SCOTT ALAN KLINE. (jcw) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Change of Address by SCOTT ALAN KLINE (Address updated to Jefferson Correctional Institution, 1050 Big Joe Road, Monticello, Florida 32344) (jcw) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The clerk of court is directed to assess Plaintiff an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $33.07 pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1). Plaintiff must pay the initial partial filing fee within thirty days (10/12/2021) of the date of this order. The clerk of court is directed to mail a copy of this order with the appropriate cover letter to the Florida Department of Corrections, 501 South Calhoun St., Tallahassee, FL 32399-2500, Attention: Agency Clerk. Fee status updated to in forma pauperis. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 9/9/2021. (jcw)(cc: DOC) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • Docket(#3) Notice to Pro Se (jcw) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #1 Complaint. Referred to ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. (jcw) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by SCOTT ALAN KLINE. (jcw) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by SCOTT ALAN KLINE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(Filing fee was not paid. 2 service copies filed.) (jcw) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Edwards is a litigant