This case was last updated from PACER on 11/29/2020 at 09:32:02 (UTC).

Klim v. Azar

Case Summary

On 09/30/2020 Klim filed a Government Benefit - Medicare lawsuit against Azar. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Raag Singhal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:20-CV-81771

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Medicare

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Raag Singhal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ann Klim

Defendant

Alex M. Azar

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard Donald Schuler

Attorney at Schuler Halvorson Weisser Zoeller & Overbeck

1615 Forum Place, Suite 4-D

West Palm Beach, FL 33401-2317

Eric Hayden

Attorney at Schuler, Halvorson, Weisser, Zoeller, & Overbeck, P.A.

1615 Forum Place, Suite 4D

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Defendant Attorney

Mary Beth Ricke

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office

500 E. Broward Blvd., Suite 700

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33394

 

Court Documents

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A

#5

(#5) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Defendant's Unopposed Motion For Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint re #1 Complaint by Alex M. Azar. Attorney Mary Beth Ricke added to party Alex M. Azar(pty:dft). Responses due by 11/30/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A)(Ricke, Mary Beth) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Alex M. Azar. (amb) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

1 #2

Summon(s)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Judicial Review against Ann Klim. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13610665, filed by Ann Klim. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Hayden, Eric) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Answer Due Deadline: Alex M. Azar response due 1/12/2021. SEE DE 6 ORDER (ail) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant's Response/Answer due by 1/12/2021. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 11/13/2020. (pb00) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Defendant's Unopposed Motion For Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint re #1 Complaint by Alex M. Azar. Attorney Mary Beth Ricke added to party Alex M. Azar(pty:dft). Responses due by 11/30/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A)(Ricke, Mary Beth) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICEUnless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall: be double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c). The Court cautions parties against excessive use of footnotes.Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions.Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 10/1/2020. (pb00) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Alex M. Azar. (amb) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Judicial Review against Ann Klim. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13610665, filed by Ann Klim. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Hayden, Eric) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less