This case was last updated from PACER on 08/12/2019 at 07:25:17 (UTC).

Klenotich v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/13/2019 Klenotich filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Equifax Information Services LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Eric C. Tostrud and Becky R. Thorson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:19-CV-01556

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eric C. Tostrud

Referral Judge

Becky R. Thorson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Robert M Klenotich

Robert M. Klenotich

Defendants

Equifax Information Services LLC

Credit One Bank NA

Credit One Bank, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas J Lyons, Jr

Attorney at Consumer Justice Center P.A.

367 Commerce Court

Vadnais Heights, MN 55127

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher J Haugen

Attorney at Messerli & Kramer P.A.

100 South Fifth Street, 1400 Fifth Street Towers

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Terri A Running

Attorney at Messerli & Kramer P.A.

100 South Fifth Street, Suite 1400

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Theodore Roethke

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

1180 Peachtree Street Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309

Daniel J Young

Attorney at Quarles & Brady LLP

100 South 5Th Street, Ste 1800

Minneapolis, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore Roethke on behalf of Equifax Information Services LLC. (Roethke, Theodore) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

#12

(#12) Defendant Credit One Bank, N.A.'s ANSWER to Complaint filed by Credit One Bank, N.A.. (Young, Daniel) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

#5

(#5) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT that Equifax is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Equifax Inc. (Running, Terri) Modified text on 7/9/2019 (kt). (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Trial Demanded against Credit One Bank NA, Equifax Information Services LLC (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6935654) filed by Robert M Klenotich. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lyons, Thomas) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Credit One Bank, N.A.. (Young, Daniel) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#8

(#8) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Credit One Financial is a corporate parent of Defendant Credit One Bank, N.A.. (Young, Daniel) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Credit One Bank, N.A., Equifax Information Services LLC. (ACH) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Running, Terri) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Credit One Bank, N.A. answer due 8/6/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 7/12/2019. (MSK) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

10 #1

Consent Form

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J Young on behalf of Credit One Bank, N.A.. (Young, Daniel) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 9/10/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 7/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MSK) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Defendant Credit One Bank, N.A.'s ANSWER to Complaint filed by Credit One Bank, N.A.. (Young, Daniel) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore Roethke on behalf of Equifax Information Services LLC. (Roethke, Theodore) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 9/10/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 7/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MSK) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Credit One Bank, N.A. answer due 8/6/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 7/12/2019. (MSK) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Credit One Financial is a corporate parent of Defendant Credit One Bank, N.A.. (Young, Daniel) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J Young on behalf of Credit One Bank, N.A.. (Young, Daniel) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Credit One Bank, N.A.. (Young, Daniel) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT that Equifax is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Equifax Inc. (Running, Terri) Modified text on 7/9/2019 (kt). (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Running, Terri) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Credit One Bank, N.A., Equifax Information Services LLC. (ACH) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • (#2) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 19-cv-1556 ECT/BRT. (ACH) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Trial Demanded against Credit One Bank NA, Equifax Information Services LLC (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6935654) filed by Robert M Klenotich. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lyons, Thomas) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.