This case was last updated from PACER on 10/24/2020 at 08:57:00 (UTC).

Kleinschmidt v. Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 08/25/2020 Kleinschmidt filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Allstate Fire Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian Morris and John Johnston. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00074

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Montana District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian Morris

Referral Judge

John Johnston

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kristy Kleinschmidt

Defendant

Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michele Reinhart Levine

Attorney at LINNELL NEWHALL MARTIN & SCHULKE

Po Box 2629

Great Falls, MT 59403

J. Kim Schulke

Attorney at LINNELL NEWHALL MARTIN & SCHULKE

Po Box 2629

Great Falls, MT 59403

Defendant Attorneys

Kaitlyn J. McArthur

Attorney at SMITH OBLANDER & MEADE, P.C.

104 2Nd Street South, Suite 400, Po Box 2685

Great Falls, MT 59403-2685

Stephanie A. Oblander

Attorney at SMITH OBLANDER & MEADE, P.C.

104 2Nd Street South, Suite 400, Po Box 2685

Great Falls, MT 59403-2685

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Preliminary Pretrial Conference scheduled for October 28, 2020, at 4:00 pm is hereby vacated, as is the deadline for parties to file their preliminary pretrial statements. The parties shall file a stipulation for dismissal and submit a proposed order of dismissal to the undersigned on or before November 21, 2020, or show good cause for their failure to do so. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/21/2020. (SLR) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

11 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Vacating Prelim Pretrial Conf

#11

(#11) Unopposed MOTION to Vacate Preliminary Pretrial Conference Stephanie A. Oblander appearing for Defendant Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Vacating Prelim Pretrial Conf) (Oblander, Stephanie) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#10

(#10) JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Kristy Kleinschmidt. (Levine, Michele) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#9

(#9) STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Kristy Kleinschmidt. (Levine, Michele) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#8

(#8) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER; Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 10/21/2020. Joint Discovery Plan due by 10/21/2020. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 10/21/2020. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 10/28/2020 at 04:00 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 9/22/2020. (TLO) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#7

(#7) Order Withholding Consent. Consent to the jurisdiction of the U.S. Magistrate Judge having been either withheld or met with objection, this case remains ASSIGNED to the Honorable Honorable Brian Morris. The referral is TERMINATED and the Honorable Magistrate Judge John Johnston no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 9/22/2020. (ACC) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#6

(#6) Mailing of Consent - Honorable John Johnston as Presiding Judge. Electroncially mailed to counsel Stephanie A. Oblander, Kaitlyn J. McArthur, Michele Reinhart Levine, J. Kim Schulke. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 9/21/2020. (ACC) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. (Oblander, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. (Oblander, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT (State Court) and DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, filed by Kristy Kleinschmidt. (ACC) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal from Montana Eighth Judicial District Court, Cascade County, consisting of: (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket Sheet, #2 Notice of Removal, #3 Issued Summons - CT Corporation, #4 Summons Return Served) (ACC) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

1 #5

Exhibit 5 - Policy Docs

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - State Court Docket

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Issued Summons

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - CT Transmittal

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from MT Eighth Judicial District Court, Cascade County, case number CDV-20-0392. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - CT Transmittal, #3 Exhibit 3 - Issued Summons, #4 Exhibit 4 - State Court Docket, #5 Exhibit 5 - Policy Docs, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (ACC) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Preliminary Pretrial Conference scheduled for October 28, 2020, at 4:00 pm is hereby vacated, as is the deadline for parties to file their preliminary pretrial statements. The parties shall file a stipulation for dismissal and submit a proposed order of dismissal to the undersigned on or before November 21, 2020, or show good cause for their failure to do so. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/21/2020. (SLR) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Unopposed MOTION to Vacate Preliminary Pretrial Conference Stephanie A. Oblander appearing for Defendant Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Vacating Prelim Pretrial Conf) (Oblander, Stephanie) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Kristy Kleinschmidt. (Levine, Michele) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Kristy Kleinschmidt. (Levine, Michele) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER; Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 10/21/2020. Joint Discovery Plan due by 10/21/2020. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 10/21/2020. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 10/28/2020 at 04:00 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 9/22/2020. (TLO) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Order Withholding Consent. Consent to the jurisdiction of the U.S. Magistrate Judge having been either withheld or met with objection, this case remains ASSIGNED to the Honorable Honorable Brian Morris. The referral is TERMINATED and the Honorable Magistrate Judge John Johnston no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 9/22/2020. (ACC) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Mailing of Consent - Honorable John Johnston as Presiding Judge. Electroncially mailed to counsel Stephanie A. Oblander, Kaitlyn J. McArthur, Michele Reinhart Levine, J. Kim Schulke. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 9/21/2020. (ACC) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. (Oblander, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. (Oblander, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketRemark: Original State Court documents from Montana Eighth Judicial District Court, Cascade County, placed in brown expando on back shelf in Clerk's Office. (ACC) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT (State Court) and DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, filed by Kristy Kleinschmidt. (ACC) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal from Montana Eighth Judicial District Court, Cascade County, consisting of: (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket Sheet, #2 Notice of Removal, #3 Issued Summons - CT Corporation, #4 Summons Return Served) (ACC) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketFiling fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0977-2532732 (ACC) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from MT Eighth Judicial District Court, Cascade County, case number CDV-20-0392. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - CT Transmittal, #3 Exhibit 3 - Issued Summons, #4 Exhibit 4 - State Court Docket, #5 Exhibit 5 - Policy Docs, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (ACC) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less