This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/15/2022 at 07:51:48 (UTC).

Kleiner v. Cengage Learning Holdings II, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/14/2022 Kleiner filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Cengage Learning Holdings II, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Stearns. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-10245

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Stearns

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fred Kleiner

Defendants

Cengage Learning Holdings II, Inc.

Cengage Learning, Inc.

Doe Affiliated Entities 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Edward V. Colbert, III

Attorney at Casner & Edwards LLP

303 Congress Street

Boston, MA 02210

David Slarskey

Attorney at Slarskey LLC

420 Lexington Avenue, Suite 2525

New York, NY 10170

Richard Weingarten

Attorney at Slarskey LLC

420 Lexington Avenue, Suite 2525

New York, NY 10170

Defendant Attorneys

Michael H. Gibson

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

230 Park Avenue, Suite 1130

New York, NY 10169

Alanna B. Newman

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

230 Park Avenue, Ste 1130

New York, NY 10169

Michael R. Gottfried

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

100 High Street, Suite 2400

Boston, MA 02110-1724

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) MEMORANDUM in Support re #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Cengage Learning Holdings II, Inc., Cengage Learning, Inc.. (Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

19 #2

Exhibit Email (redacted)

19 #1

Exhibit Agreement (redacted)

19 #19

Main Document

#18

(#18) CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 7.1 re #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #17 Corporate Disclosure Statement, by Michael R. Gottfried on behalf of Cengage Learning, Inc., Cengage Learning Holdings II, Inc. filed by on behalf of Cengage Learning, Inc., Cengage Learning Holdings II, Inc.. (Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#17

(#17) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cengage Learning Holdings II, Inc., Cengage Learning, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Cengage Learning Holdings II, Inc., Other Affiliate KKR Asset Management, Other Affiliate KKR & Co. L.P., for Cengage Learning Holdings II, Inc., Cengage Learning, Inc... (Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#16

(#16) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Cengage Learning Holdings II, Inc., Cengage Learning, Inc..(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Alanna B. Newman on behalf of Cengage Learning Holdings II, Inc., Cengage Learning, Inc. (Newman, Alanna) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

13 #13

Main Document

9 #9

Main Document

7 #1

Affidavit of Michael Gibson

7 #7

Main Document

#5

(#6) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time. (RGS, law2) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Gottfried on behalf of Cengage Learning Holdings II, Inc., Cengage Learning, Inc. (Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Barbosa, Nilsa) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

1 #2

Category Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MEMORANDUM in Support re #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Cengage Learning Holdings II, Inc., Cengage Learning, Inc.. (Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) AFFIDAVIT of Xavier J. Aguilar in Support re #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Cengage Learning Holdings II, Inc., Cengage Learning, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Agreement (redacted), #2 Exhibit Email (redacted))(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 7.1 re #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #17 Corporate Disclosure Statement, by Michael R. Gottfried on behalf of Cengage Learning, Inc., Cengage Learning Holdings II, Inc. filed by on behalf of Cengage Learning, Inc., Cengage Learning Holdings II, Inc.. (Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cengage Learning Holdings II, Inc., Cengage Learning, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Cengage Learning Holdings II, Inc., Other Affiliate KKR Asset Management, Other Affiliate KKR & Co. L.P., for Cengage Learning Holdings II, Inc., Cengage Learning, Inc... (Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Cengage Learning Holdings II, Inc., Cengage Learning, Inc..(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Alanna B. Newman on behalf of Cengage Learning Holdings II, Inc., Cengage Learning, Inc. (Newman, Alanna) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Alanna B. Newman. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Warnock, Douglas) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Alanna B. Newman Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9264288 by Cengage Learning Holdings II, Inc., Cengage Learning, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added David Slarskey and Richard Weingarten. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael H. Gibson on behalf of Cengage Learning Holdings II, Inc., Cengage Learning, Inc. (Gibson, Michael) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Richard Weingarten Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9239562 by Fred Kleiner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pro Hac Vice Certification)(Colbert, Edward) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of David Slarskey Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9239548 by Fred Kleiner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pro Hac Vice Certification)(Colbert, Edward) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Michael H. Gibson. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 03/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael H. Gibson Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9233235 by Cengage Learning Holdings II, Inc., Cengage Learning, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael Gibson)(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time. (RGS, law2) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to April 11, 2022 to Respond to the Complaint by Cengage Learning Holdings II, Inc., Cengage Learning, Inc..(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Gottfried on behalf of Cengage Learning Holdings II, Inc., Cengage Learning, Inc. (Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Barbosa, Nilsa) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9184655 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Fred Kleiner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Colbert, Edward) (Attachment 1 and Attachment 2 replaced on 2/15/2022 to correct Civil Cover Sheet and Category Form). (Barbosa, Nilsa). (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cengage Learning, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alan B Newman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael R. Gottfried