This case was last updated from PACER on 08/06/2019 at 07:30:34 (UTC).

Klein vs Pinnacle Services, Inc

Case Summary

On 06/07/2019 Klein filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Pinnacle Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are William G. Cobb and Larry R. Hicks. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00311

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

William G. Cobb

Presiding Judge

Larry R. Hicks

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eli R. Klein

Defendant

Pinnacle Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael C. Lehners

Attorney at Law Office of Michael Lehners

429 Marsh Ave

Reno, NV 89509

Defendant Attorney

Clifton J Young

Attorney at Clifton Young, Esq.

491 Court Street

Reno, NV 89501

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) NOTICE OF 26(f) CONFERENCE by Eli R. Klein. (Lehners, Michael) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Pinnacle Services, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Young, Clifton) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Pinnacle Services, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/16/2019.(Young, Clifton) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF INTENT TO TAKE DEFAULT by Eli R. Klein re #1 Complaint, #5 Summons Returned Executed. (Lehners, Michael) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Eli R. Klein. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Lehners, Michael) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eli R. Klein re #4 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,. All Defendants. (Lehners, Michael) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Pinnacle Services, Inc.. (DRM) (Main Document 4 replaced on 6/10/2019) (DRM). (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#3

(#3) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff ELI R KLEIN. (Lehners, Michael) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET to #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff ELI R KLEIN. (Lehners, Michael) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against PINNACLE SERVICES, INC dba SUMMIT COLLECTIONS SERVICES (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5579796) by ELI R KLEIN. Proof of service due by 9/5/2019.(Lehners, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 06/07/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE OF 26(f) CONFERENCE by Eli R. Klein. (Lehners, Michael) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Filer's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. 10 , #8 . Attorney Clifton Young is advised to review and update his/her user account information. (no image attached) (WJ) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Filer's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #8 . Attorney Clifton Young is advised to review and update his/her user account information. (no image attached) (WJ) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Pinnacle Services, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Young, Clifton) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Pinnacle Services, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/16/2019.(Young, Clifton) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF INTENT TO TAKE DEFAULT by Eli R. Klein re #1 Complaint, #5 Summons Returned Executed. (Lehners, Michael) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Eli R. Klein. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Lehners, Michael) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eli R. Klein re #4 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,. All Defendants. (Lehners, Michael) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Pinnacle Services, Inc.. (DRM) (Main Document 4 replaced on 6/10/2019) (DRM). (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Case randomly assigned to District Judge Larry R. Hicks and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff ELI R KLEIN. (Lehners, Michael) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET to #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff ELI R KLEIN. (Lehners, Michael) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against PINNACLE SERVICES, INC dba SUMMIT COLLECTIONS SERVICES (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5579796) by ELI R KLEIN. Proof of service due by 9/5/2019.(Lehners, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.