This case was last updated from PACER on 12/30/2019 at 08:34:15 (UTC).

Klein v. Nelson Snuffer Dahle Poulsen PC

Case Summary

On 10/31/2019 Klein filed an Other lawsuit against Nelson Snuffer Dahle Poulsen PC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judges overseeing this case are David Nuffer and Paul Kohler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00851

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Utah District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David Nuffer

Referral Judge

Paul Kohler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

R. Wayne Klein

Defendant

Nelson Snuffer Dahle Poulsen PC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffery A. Balls

Attorney at PARR BROWN GEE & LOVELESS

101 S 200 E Ste 700

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Michael S. Lehr

Attorney at PARR BROWN GEE & LOVELESS

101 S 200 E Ste 700

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Jonathan O. Hafen

Attorney at PARR BROWN GEE & LOVELESS

101 S 200 E Ste 700

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Defendant Attorney

Michael F. Skolnick

Attorney at KIPP & CHRISTIAN

10 Exchange Place Fourth Fl

Salt Lake City, UT 84111-2314

 

Court Documents

2 #1

Exhibit A - Transfers Summary

#1

(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Nuffer. Plaintiff R. Wayne Klein is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

#7

(#7) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant Nelson Snuffer Dahle Poulsen PC. (Skolnick, Michael) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against Nelson Snuffer Dahle Poulsen PC (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3408117) filed by R. Wayne Klein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Transfers Summary, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (Balls, Jeffery) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

#6

(#6) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgment filed by R. Wayne Klein.Nelson Snuffer Dahle Poulsen PC served on 11/4/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (Lehr, Michael) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

2 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#3

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Nelson Snuffer Dahle Poulsen PC. Attorney Michael F. Skolnick added to party Nelson Snuffer Dahle Poulsen PC(pty:dft)(Skolnick, Michael) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant Nelson Snuffer Dahle Poulsen PC. (Skolnick, Michael) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgment filed by R. Wayne Klein.Nelson Snuffer Dahle Poulsen PC served on 11/4/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (Lehr, Michael) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Nelson Snuffer Dahle Poulsen PC. Attorney Michael F. Skolnick added to party Nelson Snuffer Dahle Poulsen PC(pty:dft)(Skolnick, Michael) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • (#4) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 11/5/2019. (asb) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Nelson Snuffer Dahle Poulsen PC. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against Nelson Snuffer Dahle Poulsen PC (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3408117) filed by R. Wayne Klein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Transfers Summary, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (Balls, Jeffery) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Nuffer. Plaintiff R. Wayne Klein is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.