This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/01/2021 at 07:54:19 (UTC).

Allison Klein v. Ljubljana Inter Auto d.o.o. et al

Case Summary

On 11/02/2020 Allison Klein filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Ljubljana Inter Auto d o o. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jean P. Rosenbluth and Dolly M. Gee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-10079

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jean P. Rosenbluth

Presiding Judge

Dolly M. Gee

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Allison Klein

Defendants

Prosche Cars North America Inc

Ljubljana Inter Auto d.o.o.

Dr. Ing. h.c.F. Porsche AG

Porsche Cars North America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Filippo Marchino

Attorney at The X-Law Group PC

625 Fair Oaks Avenue Suite 390

South Pasadena, CA 91030-5817

Carlos X Colorado

Attorney at X Law group PC

625 Fair Oaksavenue Suite 390

South Pasadena, CA 91030

Thomas Edward Gray

Attorney at The X-Law Group PC

625 Fair Oaks Avenue Suite 390

South Pasadena, CA 91030

Defendant Attorneys

Nathaniel James Tarvin

Attorney at Lee Hong Degerman Kang and Waimey PC

3501 Jamboree Road Suite 6000

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Anika P Brunson

Attorney at Lee Hong Degerman Kang and Waimey

3501 Jamboree Road Suite 6000

Newport Beach, CA 92660

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

#14

#15

#16

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - REASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO JUDGE GEE by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Please take notice that this action has been reassigned to the HONORABLE DOLLY M. GEE, United States District Judge, pursuant to the Order re Reassign Pursuant to General Order 19-03 filed on December 10, 2020. Additional information about Judge Gee's procedures and schedules is available on the court's website at www.cacd.uscourt.gov. See minute order for details. (lom) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Consuelo B. Marshall to Judge Dolly M. Gee for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-10079-DMG (JPRx). (aco) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Allison Klein, upon Defendant Porsche Cars North America, Inc. served on 11/23/2020, answer due 1/13/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation Systems, Agent For Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Marchino, Filippo) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. (ys) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Porsche Cars North America, Inc. answer now due 1/13/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Porsche Cars North America, Inc..(Attorney Anika P Brunson added to party Porsche Cars North America, Inc.(pty:dft))(Brunson, Anika) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Ljubljana Inter Auto d.o.o. (shb) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Dr. Ing. h.c.F. Porsche AG. (shb) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Porsche Cars North America, Inc. (shb) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Allison Klein. (Marchino, Filippo) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Allison Klein. (Marchino, Filippo) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Allison Klein. (Marchino, Filippo) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (lh) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Allison Klein, (Marchino, Filippo) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Allison Klein. (Marchino, Filippo) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28825782 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Allison Klein. (Attorney Filippo Marchino added to party Allison Klein(pty:pla))(Marchino, Filippo) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dr. Ing. h.c. F. Porsche AG is a litigant

Latest cases where PORSCHE CARS NORTH AMERICA INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nathaniel James Tarvin