This case was last updated from PACER on 12/16/2019 at 08:12:13 (UTC).

Klein v. Armand

Case Summary

On 10/17/2019 Klein filed an Other lawsuit against Armand. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judges overseeing this case are Clark Waddoups, Paul Kohler and David Nuffer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00779

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Utah District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Paul Kohler

Presiding Judges

Clark Waddoups

David Nuffer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

R. Wayne Klein

Defendant

Jean R. Armand

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffery A. Balls

Attorney at PARR BROWN GEE & LOVELESS

101 S 200 E Ste 700

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Michael S. Lehr

Attorney at PARR BROWN GEE & LOVELESS

101 S 200 E Ste 700

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Jonathan O. Hafen

Attorney at PARR BROWN GEE & LOVELESS

101 S 200 E Ste 700

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Filing of Receiver's Motion to Transfer Related Cases Pursuant to DUCivR 83-2(g) by R. Wayne Klein (Lehr, Michael) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against Jean R. Armand (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3397183) filed by R. Wayne Klein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Transfers Summary, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups (Balls, Jeffery) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

#1

(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups. Plaintiff R. Wayne Klein is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER OF RECUSAL Judge Clark Waddoups recused. Case reassigned to Judge Tena Campbell for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 10/18/2019. (las) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

2 #1

Exhibit A - Transfers Summary

2 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#7

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Jean R. Armand. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • (#6) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 10/29/2019. (asb) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • (#5) Case reassigned to Judge David Nuffer per General Order 19-003. Judge Tena Campbell no longer assigned to the case. (jwt) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Filing of Receiver's Motion to Transfer Related Cases Pursuant to DUCivR 83-2(g) by R. Wayne Klein (Lehr, Michael) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER OF RECUSAL Judge Clark Waddoups recused. Case reassigned to Judge Tena Campbell for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 10/18/2019. (las) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against Jean R. Armand (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3397183) filed by R. Wayne Klein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Transfers Summary, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups (Balls, Jeffery) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups. Plaintiff R. Wayne Klein is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.