This case was last updated from PACER on 07/29/2019 at 07:06:22 (UTC).

Klein Tools, Inc. v. Ideal Industries, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/30/2019 Klein Tools, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Ideal Industries, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Virginia M. Kendall. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03604

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Virginia M. Kendall

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Klein Tools, Inc.

Defendant

Ideal Industries, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David M. Airan

Attorney at Leydig, Voit & Mayer, Ltd.

Two Prudential Plaza, 180 N. Stetson Ave. #4900

Chicago, IL 60601-6780

Elias P. Soupos

Attorney at Leydig, Voit & Mayer Ltd.

180 N. Stetson Avenue, Two Prudential Plaza

Chicago, IL 60601

Catherine Taylor

Attorney at Leydig, Voit & Mayer, Ltd.

180 Stetson Ave #4900

Chicago, IL 60601

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew Joshua Levinstein

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig Llp

77 West Wacker Drive, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60601

Benjamin Patrick Gilford

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, Llp

77 W. Wacker Drive, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60601

Callie J. Sand

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP

77 W Wacker, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60601

James J. Lukas, Jr

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

77 West Wacker Drive, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Motion by James J. Lukas, Jr for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #18 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 7/30/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Lukas, James) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

#18

(#18) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Ideal Industries, Inc. (Lukas, James) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

#17

(#17) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Defendant's Unopposed Motion for extension of time to answer and continue the Initial Status hearing #15 is granted. Answer shall be due by 7/22/2019. Joint Status Report due by 7/29/2019. Initial Status hearing reset for 8/1/2019 at 9:00 AM. Motion hearing set for 6/26/2019 is stricken.Mailed notice (lk, ) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Motion by James J. Lukas, Jr for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer,, motion to continue, #15 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 6/26/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Lukas, James) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

#15

(#15) MOTION by Defendant Ideal Industries, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint, #1 , MOTION by Defendant Ideal Industries, Inc. to continue the Initial Status Hearing, and to Defer the Filing of the Joint Status Report [Unopposed] (Lukas, James) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

#14

(#14) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Ideal Industries, Inc. by Callie J. Sand (Sand, Callie) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

#13

(#13) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Ideal Industries, Inc. by Matthew Joshua Levinstein (Levinstein, Matthew) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

#12

(#12) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Ideal Industries, Inc. by Benjamin Patrick Gilford (Gilford, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

#11

(#11) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Ideal Industries, Inc. by James J. Lukas, Jr (Lukas, James) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Klein Tools, Inc. (Airan, David) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Klein Tools, Inc. by David M. Airan (Airan, David) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Airan, David) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#1

(#15) MOTION by Defendant Ideal Industries, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint, #1 , MOTION by Defendant Ideal Industries, Inc. to continue the Initial Status Hearing, and to Defer the Filing of the Joint Status Report [Unopposed] (Lukas, James) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE of Motion by James J. Lukas, Jr for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #18 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 7/30/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Lukas, James) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Ideal Industries, Inc. (Lukas, James) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Defendant's Unopposed Motion for extension of time to answer and continue the Initial Status hearing #15 is granted. Answer shall be due by 7/22/2019. Joint Status Report due by 7/29/2019. Initial Status hearing reset for 8/1/2019 at 9:00 AM. Motion hearing set for 6/26/2019 is stricken.Mailed notice (lk, ) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE of Motion by James J. Lukas, Jr for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer,, motion to continue, #15 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 6/26/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Lukas, James) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION by Defendant Ideal Industries, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint, #1 , MOTION by Defendant Ideal Industries, Inc. to continue the Initial Status Hearing, and to Defer the Filing of the Joint Status Report [Unopposed] (Lukas, James) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Ideal Industries, Inc. by Callie J. Sand (Sand, Callie) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Ideal Industries, Inc. by Matthew Joshua Levinstein (Levinstein, Matthew) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Ideal Industries, Inc. by Benjamin Patrick Gilford (Gilford, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Ideal Industries, Inc. by James J. Lukas, Jr (Lukas, James) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial status hearing set for 7/11/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Joint Status Report due by 7/8/2019. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Mailed notice (lk, ) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MAILED Patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (pk, ) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Ideal Industries, Inc. (mc, ) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Klein Tools, Inc. by Elias P. Soupos (Soupos, Elias) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Klein Tools, Inc. by Catherine Taylor (Taylor, Catherine) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Report to the USPTO on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark by Klein Tools, Inc. (Airan, David) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Klein Tools, Inc. (Airan, David) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Klein Tools, Inc. by David M. Airan (Airan, David) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Airan, David) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Klein Tools, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15879869. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Airan, David) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin Patrick Gilford

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Callie J. Sand

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James J. Lukas, Jr