Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/31/2020 at 09:23:09 (UTC).

Klein et. al. v. Pronova Solutions, LLC, et. al. (PLR2)

Case Summary

On 09/01/2020 Klein filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Pronova Solutions, LLC, PLR2. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Debra C Poplin and Clifton L Corker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00393

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Debra C Poplin

Presiding Judge

Clifton L Corker

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Judith Klein

Vebi Gjyliqi

Michael Kuras

Jeffrey Klein

The Entrust Group Inc.

Patrick Marsh

Defendants

Pronova Solutions

Terry Douglass

Joseph Matteo

Pronova Solutions, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael K Atkins

Attorney at Baker, O'Kane, Atkins & Thompson

2607 Kingston Pike, Suite 200, P O Box 1708

Knoxville, TN 37901-1708

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joseph Matteo. Joseph Matteo waiver sent on 9/22/2020. (Fields, Rodney) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

#14

(#14) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Pronova Solutions, LLC. Pronova Solutions, LLC waiver sent on 9/22/2020. (Fields, Rodney) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

#13

(#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Terry Douglass. Terry Douglass waiver sent on 9/23/2020. (Fields, Rodney) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

#12

(#12) SUPPLEMENT CERTIFICATE OF CORPORATE INTEREST by Patrick Marsh. (Atkins, Michael) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#11

(#11) SUPPLEMENT CIVIL COVER SHEET by Patrick Marsh. (Atkins, Michael) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#10

(#10) SUPPLEMENT Exhibit to the Complaint by Patrick Marsh. (Atkins, Michael) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#9

(#9) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on September 2, 2020. (SAC) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#8

(#8) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on September 2, 2020. (SAC) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#7

(#7) Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on September 2, 2020. (SAC) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

6 #2

Summons Matteo

6 #1

Summons Douglass

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Pronova Solutions, LLC, Terry Douglass, Joseph Matteo. (Attachments: #1 Summons Douglass, #2 Summons Matteo)(SAC) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#5

(#5) Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Complaint : requirements due by 9/3/2020. Civil Case Cover Sheet needs to be filed.(SAC) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#4

(#4) SUPPLEMENT Summons to be issued by Patrick Marsh. (Atkins, Michael) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

#3

(#3) SUPPLEMENT Summons to be issued by Patrick Marsh. (Atkins, Michael) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

#2

(#2) SUPPLEMENT Summons to be issued by Patrick Marsh. (Atkins, Michael) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4467187.), filed by Patrick Marsh.(Atkins, Michael) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. District Judge Pamela L Reeves no longer assigned to case Case reassigned to District Judge Clifton L Corker for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 9/23/20. (ABF) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joseph Matteo. Joseph Matteo waiver sent on 9/22/2020. (Fields, Rodney) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Pronova Solutions, LLC. Pronova Solutions, LLC waiver sent on 9/22/2020. (Fields, Rodney) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Terry Douglass. Terry Douglass waiver sent on 9/23/2020. (Fields, Rodney) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUPPLEMENT CERTIFICATE OF CORPORATE INTEREST by Patrick Marsh. (Atkins, Michael) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUPPLEMENT CIVIL COVER SHEET by Patrick Marsh. (Atkins, Michael) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUPPLEMENT Exhibit to the Complaint by Patrick Marsh. (Atkins, Michael) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on September 2, 2020. (SAC) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on September 2, 2020. (SAC) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on September 2, 2020. (SAC) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Pronova Solutions, LLC, Terry Douglass, Joseph Matteo. (Attachments: #1 Summons Douglass, #2 Summons Matteo)(SAC) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketDistrict Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (SAC) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by The Entrust Group Inc. (SAC) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Complaint : requirements due by 9/3/2020. Civil Case Cover Sheet needs to be filed.(SAC) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUPPLEMENT Summons to be issued by Patrick Marsh. (Atkins, Michael) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUPPLEMENT Summons to be issued by Patrick Marsh. (Atkins, Michael) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUPPLEMENT Summons to be issued by Patrick Marsh. (Atkins, Michael) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4467187.), filed by Patrick Marsh.(Atkins, Michael) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE ENTRUST GROUP INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION FBO JAMES MARTIN CLARK ACCOUNT NUMBER 7230011412 is a litigant