This case was last updated from PACER on 03/23/2020 at 15:40:16 (UTC).

Klee v. GEICO General Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 Klee filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against GEICO General Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Christopher P. Tuite. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-00163

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charlene Edwards Honeywell

Referral Judge

Christopher P. Tuite

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ryan Matthew Klee

Defendant

GEICO General Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dale S. Appell

Attorney at Law Offices of Dale S. Appell, PA

100 S Edison Ave Ste A

Tampa, FL 33606-1952

Defendant Attorney

Jordan Marshall Thompson

Attorney at Young, Bill, Boles, Palmer & Duke P.A.

401 E Jackson St Ste 2950

Tampa, FL 33602-5214

 

Court Documents

1 #3

Exhibit 3

#4

(#4) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 2/6/2020. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 1/23/2020. (BGS) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

1 #9

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 2/6/2020. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 1/23/2020. (BGS) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 13th Judicial Circuit Hillsborough County, case number 19-CA-012696 filed in State Court on 12/17/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16384414 filed by GEICO General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint - Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 State Court Docket Sheet, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Thompson, Jordan) Modified on 1/23/2020 (MCB). (Entered: 01/22/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #8

State Court Docket Sheet

#5

(#5) NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Ryan Matthew Klee (Appell, Dale) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

1 #6

Exhibit 6

#6

(#6) ORDER dismissing case without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to terminate any pending motions and deadlines and CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 1/30/2020. (BGS) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #7

Exhibit 7

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #1

Exhibit 1

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER dismissing case without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to terminate any pending motions and deadlines and CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 1/30/2020. (BGS) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Ryan Matthew Klee (Appell, Dale) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 2/6/2020. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 1/23/2020. (BGS) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 2/6/2020. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 1/23/2020. (BGS) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • (#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:20-cv-163-T-36CPT. (SJB) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 13th Judicial Circuit Hillsborough County, case number 19-CA-012696 filed in State Court on 12/17/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16384414 filed by GEICO General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint - Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 State Court Docket Sheet, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Thompson, Jordan) Modified on 1/23/2020 (MCB). (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.