This case was last updated from PACER on 11/10/2019 at 07:56:52 (UTC).

Kleber v. Gilbert et al

Case Summary

On 09/11/2019 a Contract - Other Contract case was filed by Kleber against Gilbert in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00367

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph M. Hood

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Kendra S. Kleber

Defendants and Counter Claimants

The Law Offices of Gary M. Gilbert and Associates, P.C

David karman

Gary M. Gilbert

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Gregory E.J. Coulson

Attorney at Butcher & Coulson Firm, PLLC

157 North Limestone Street, Suite 230

Lexington, KY 40507

Steven Chad Butcher

Attorney at Butcher & Coulson Firm, PLLC

157 North Limestone Street, Suite 230

Lexington, KY 40507

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Anthony Pernice

Attorney at Reminger & Reminger Co., LPA - Lexington

333 W. Vine Street, Suite 1670

Lexington, KY 40507

Kenneth L. Finley

Attorney at Reminger Co., LPA - Lexington

269 W Main St, Suite 700

Lexington, KY 40507

Sean T. Needham

Attorney at Reminger & Reminger Co., L.P.A. - Cleveland

101 Prospect Avenue, West, 1400 Midland Building

Cleveland, OH 44115

 

Court Documents

9 #2

Affidavit of Clarification

9 #1

Memorandum in Support of Remand to State Court

#9

(#9) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Kendra S. Kleber (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Remand to State Court, #2 Affidavit of Clarification, #3 Proposed Order Remanding to State Court)(Butcher, Steven) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED as follows: (1) Within 21 days from the date of service of this order, parties shall meet to discuss the nature and basis of their claims & defenses and possibilities for a settlement or resolution of the case. (2) Within 10 days after meeting parties shall file a joint status report containing: a)the discovery plan; b) parties' estimate of time necessary to file pretrial motions; c) probably length of trial; d) dates mutually convenient for trial; e) decision as to whether the action may be referred to a US Magistrate Judge; f) determination whether resolution of case may be aided by mediation or other special procedures. Each party is directed to advise the Court at the time of the submission of the joint report of all parent corporations, subsidiaries, affiliates, members and/or partners w/ which it is associated, to the extent the party has not already done so. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 09/19/2019. (MDC) cc: COR (Entered: 09/19/2019)

7 #1

Exhibit 1 - Agreement

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint of Kendra S. Kleber, COUNTERCLAIM of The Law Offices of Gary M. Gilbert and Associates, P.C. against Kendra S. Kleber by David Karman, Gary M. Gilbert, The Law Offices of Gary M. Gilbert and Associates, P.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Agreement)(Finley, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER: 1) Plaintiff's #5 Motion for Sean T. Needham to Appear Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED; 2) Sean T. Needham shall be admitted to appear pro hac vice as counsel for by Defendants Gary M. Gilbert, David Karman, The Law Offices of Gary M. Gilbert and Associates, P.C.; and 3) Sean T. Needham shall be subject to the jurisdiction and rules of the Kentucky Supreme Court. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 9/16/2019. (JJ)cc: COR, Needham w/ ECF Registration Form (Entered: 09/16/2019)

5 #3

Proposed Order

#5

(#5) MOTION for Sean T. Needham to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gary M. Gilbert, The Law Offices of Gary M. Gilbert and Associates, P.C, David karman ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4464645) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 - Cert. of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Finley, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

#4

(#4) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Gary M. Gilbert, The Law Offices of Gary M. Gilbert and Associates, P.C, David karman. (Finley, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Kenneth L. Finley & Anthony Pernice has been filed by The Law Offices of Gary M. Gilbert and Associates, P.C. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (MDC) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Notice of Removal

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - State Court Record

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fayette Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-2707. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4462187), filed by David karman, Gary M. Gilbert, The Law Offices of Gary M. Gilbert and Associates, P.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(MDC) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Joseph M. Hood for review: re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Kendra S. Kleber (MDC) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Joseph M. Hood for review: #8 Order For Meeting and Report. No Joint Status Report filed. (MDC) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Kendra S. Kleber (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Remand to State Court, #2 Affidavit of Clarification, #3 Proposed Order Remanding to State Court)(Butcher, Steven) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED as follows: (1) Within 21 days from the date of service of this order, parties shall meet to discuss the nature and basis of their claims & defenses and possibilities for a settlement or resolution of the case. (2) Within 10 days after meeting parties shall file a joint status report containing: a)the discovery plan; b) parties' estimate of time necessary to file pretrial motions; c) probably length of trial; d) dates mutually convenient for trial; e) decision as to whether the action may be referred to a US Magistrate Judge; f) determination whether resolution of case may be aided by mediation or other special procedures. Each party is directed to advise the Court at the time of the submission of the joint report of all parent corporations, subsidiaries, affiliates, members and/or partners w/ which it is associated, to the extent the party has not already done so. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 09/19/2019. (MDC) cc: COR (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to Complaint of Kendra S. Kleber, COUNTERCLAIM of The Law Offices of Gary M. Gilbert and Associates, P.C. against Kendra S. Kleber by David Karman, Gary M. Gilbert, The Law Offices of Gary M. Gilbert and Associates, P.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Agreement)(Finley, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER: 1) Plaintiff's #5 Motion for Sean T. Needham to Appear Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED; 2) Sean T. Needham shall be admitted to appear pro hac vice as counsel for by Defendants Gary M. Gilbert, David Karman, The Law Offices of Gary M. Gilbert and Associates, P.C.; and 3) Sean T. Needham shall be subject to the jurisdiction and rules of the Kentucky Supreme Court. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 9/16/2019. (JJ)cc: COR, Needham w/ ECF Registration Form (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Joseph M. Hood for review: re #5 MOTION for Sean T. Needham to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gary M. Gilbert, The Law Offices of Gary M. Gilbert and Associates, P.C, David karman ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4464645) (KM) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BAR STATUS Check completed as to Sean T. Needham re #5 MOTION for Sean T. Needham to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gary M. Gilbert, The Law Offices of Gary M. Gilbert and Associates, P.C, David karman (Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4464645). (KM) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Sean T. Needham to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gary M. Gilbert, The Law Offices of Gary M. Gilbert and Associates, P.C, David karman ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4464645) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 - Cert. of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Finley, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Gary M. Gilbert, The Law Offices of Gary M. Gilbert and Associates, P.C, David karman. (Finley, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Kenneth L. Finley & Anthony Pernice has been filed by The Law Offices of Gary M. Gilbert and Associates, P.C. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (MDC) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • Conflict Check run. (MDC) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fayette Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-2707. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4462187), filed by David karman, Gary M. Gilbert, The Law Offices of Gary M. Gilbert and Associates, P.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(MDC) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.