This case was last updated from PACER on 04/17/2021 at 12:34:33 (UTC).

KLAYMAN v. BLACKBURNE-RIGSBY et al

Case Summary

On 02/16/2021 KLAYMAN filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against BLACKBURNE-RIGSBY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Amy Berman Jackson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00409

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amy Berman Jackson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LARRY KLAYMAN

Washington, DC 20006

Defendants

ROY MCLEESE

VANESSA RUIZ

JOHN M. STEADMAN

JOHN FISHER

ERIC T. WASHINGTON

JOHN M. FERREN

Catherine Easterly

STEPHEN GLICKMAN

Corrine Beckwith

PHYLLIS D. THOMPSON

ANNA BLACKBURNE-RIGSBY

Joshua Deahl

FRANK Q. NEBEKER

Julio Castillo

ROY W. MCLEESE

STEPHEN H. GLICKMAN

JOHN R. FISHER

CORRINE A. BECKWITH

CATHARINE F. EASTERLY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Larry E. Klayman

Attorney at KLAYMAN LAW GROUP, P.A.

2020 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw, Suite 800

Washington, DC 20006

Defendant Attorneys

Pamela A. Disney

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

400 Sixth Street Nw, Suite 10100

Washington, DC 20001

Richard P. Sobiecki

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

400 6Th Street Nw

Washington, DC 20001

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #18 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by LARRY KLAYMAN. (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

18 #10

Text of Proposed Order

18 #6

Exhibit 5

18 #5

Exhibit 4

18 #4

Exhibit 3

18 #3

Exhibit 2

18 #2

Exhibit 1

18 #1

Memorandum in Support

#18

(#18) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by CORRINE A. BECKWITH, ANNA BLACKBURNE-RIGSBY, JULIO CASTILLO, JOSHUA DEAHL, CATHARINE F. EASTERLY, JOHN M. FERREN, JOHN R. FISHER, STEPHEN H. GLICKMAN, ROY W. MCLEESE, FRANK Q. NEBEKER, VANESSA RUIZ, JOHN M. STEADMAN, PHYLLIS D. THOMPSON, ERIC T. WASHINGTON. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Sobiecki, Richard) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

1 #17

Summons

1 #16

Summons

1 #15

Summons

1 #9

Summons

1 #8

Summons

1 #5

Summons

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

MINUTE ORDER. The Court will take no action with respect to the motion for injunctive relief #2 in the absence of any indication on the docket that the complaint #1 and the motion have been served. However, since a court is required to assure itself of its own jurisdiction, Sierra Club v. EPA, 292 F.3d 895, 898 (2002), plaintiff is hereby ordered to show cause by February 26, 2021 why the claims against the fourteen defendant judges of the DC Court of Appeals should not be dismissed pursuant to Rule 12(h)(3) on the grounds of judicial immunity. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/24/21. (DMK) Modified on 2/24/2021 to reflect that it is fourteen defendant judges (jth). (Entered: 02/24/2021)

68 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER granting #20 plaintiff's motion for extension of time. It is ORDERED that plaintiff's response to defendants' Motion to Dismiss and reply in further support of plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is due by May 11, 2021. It is FURTHER ORDERED that defendants' reply in support of their Motion to Dismiss is due by May 25, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/16/21. (DMK) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #18 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by LARRY KLAYMAN. (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Memorandum in opposition to re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by CORRINE A. BECKWITH, ANNA BLACKBURNE-RIGSBY, JULIO CASTILLO, JOSHUA DEAHL, CATHARINE F. EASTERLY, JOHN M. FERREN, JOHN R. FISHER, STEPHEN H. GLICKMAN, ROY W. MCLEESE, FRANK Q. NEBEKER, VANESSA RUIZ, JOHN M. STEADMAN, PHYLLIS D. THOMPSON, ERIC T. WASHINGTON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Sobiecki, Richard) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by CORRINE A. BECKWITH, ANNA BLACKBURNE-RIGSBY, JULIO CASTILLO, JOSHUA DEAHL, CATHARINE F. EASTERLY, JOHN M. FERREN, JOHN R. FISHER, STEPHEN H. GLICKMAN, ROY W. MCLEESE, FRANK Q. NEBEKER, VANESSA RUIZ, JOHN M. STEADMAN, PHYLLIS D. THOMPSON, ERIC T. WASHINGTON. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Sobiecki, Richard) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER denying #17 Motion for Leave to File. There is no Federal Rule of Civil Procedure that authorizes the docketing of plaintiff's extra-litigation correspondence. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/1/21. (DMK) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for Leave to File Correspondence by LARRY KLAYMAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #16 Notice (Other) was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading in proper format. (Counsel should review LCvR 5.1(a)CORRESPONDENCE WITH THE COURT) (zjf) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Correspondence by LARRY KLAYMAN (Klayman, Larry) Modified on 3/29/2021 (zjf). (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER granting #14 Motion to Set Deadline for Consolidated Response to Plaintiff's Complaint and Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The Court is of the view that it would benefit from briefing from both sides on the jurisdictional question raised in the order to show cause, so defendants' consolidated responsive pleading and their opposition to the motion for preliminary injunction on those or any other grounds is due on April 6, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 3/16/21. (DMK) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Pamela A. Disney on behalf of All Defendants (Disney, Pamela) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadline: Plaintiff is Ordered to Show Cause by 2/26/2021 why the claims against the fourteen defendant judges of the DC Court of Appeals should not be dismissed pursuant to Rule 12(h)(3) on the grounds of judicial immunity.(jth) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER. The Court will take no action with respect to the motion for injunctive relief #2 in the absence of any indication on the docket that the complaint #1 and the motion have been served. However, since a court is required to assure itself of its own jurisdiction, Sierra Club v. EPA, 292 F.3d 895, 898 (2002), plaintiff is hereby ordered to show cause by February 26, 2021 why the claims against the fourteen defendant judges of the DC Court of Appeals should not be dismissed pursuant to Rule 12(h)(3) on the grounds of judicial immunity. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/24/21. (DMK) Modified on 2/24/2021 to reflect that it is fourteen defendant judges (jth). (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS (14) Issued Electronically as to CORRINE A. BECKWITH, ANNA BLACKBURNE-RIGSBY, JULIO CASTILLO, JOSHUA DEAHL, CATHARINE F. EASTERLY, JOHN M. FERREN, JOHN R. FISHER, STEPHEN H. GLICKMAN, ROY W. MCLEESE, FRANK Q. NEBEKER, VANESSA RUIZ, JOHN M. STEADMAN, PHYLLIS D. THOMPSON, ERIC T. WASHINGTON, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zsb) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET by LARRY KLAYMAN re Notice of QC- New Case,, filed by LARRY KLAYMAN. Related document: Notice of QC- New Case,,.(Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to leklayman@gmail.com, cc'd 3 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Blank or missing coversheet. Please use the cover sheet at https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms & file using the event Civil Cover Sheet., 2. Form filed as fillable PDF. Please file form in a non-fillable PDF format., 3. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zsb, ) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ENTERED IN ERROR.....CIVIL COVER SHEET by LARRY KLAYMAN re Notice of QC- New Case, filed by LARRY KLAYMAN. Related document: Notice of QC- New Case,.(Klayman, Larry) Modified on 2/25/2021 (znmw). (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to leklayman@gmail.com, cc'd 3 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Blank or missing coversheet. Please use the cover sheet at https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms & file using the event Civil Cover Sheet., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zsb, ) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by LARRY KLAYMAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8211632) filed by LARRY KLAYMAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons)(Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Larry Elliot Klayman