This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/15/2022 at 09:51:53 (UTC).

Klauber Brothers, Inc. v. City Chic Collective Limited et al

Case Summary

On 03/16/2022 Klauber Brothers, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against City Chic Collective Limited. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael W. Fitzgerald and Michael R. Wilner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01743

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael W. Fitzgerald

Referral Judge

Michael R. Wilner

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KLAUBER BROTHERS, INC

Klauber Brothers, Inc.

Defendants

Nordstrom, Inc. a Washington Corporation

City Chic Collective Limited, an Australian Limited Company

DOES 1 through 10

City Chic Collective Limited

Nordstrom, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Scott A. Burroughs

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Trevor William Barrett

Attorney at Doninger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Kelsey Marie Schultz

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32957754 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff KLAUBER BROTHERS, INC. (Attorney Scott A. Burroughs added to party KLAUBER BROTHERS, INC(pty:pla))(Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff KLAUBER BROTHERS, INC. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff KLAUBER BROTHERS, INC, identifying CITY CHIC COLLECTIVE LIMITED and NORDSTROM, INC.. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

#4

(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by KLAUBER BROTHERS, INC. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

#5

(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff KLAUBER BROTHERS, INC. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (ghap) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#8

(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #5 . The following error(s) was found: Please put the Central District of California. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#10

(#10) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#11

(#11) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant City Chic Collective Limited, Nordstrom, Inc. (iv) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

#12

(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc.. upon Nordstrom, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/24/2022, answer due 5/23/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Jason P. Bloom, Esq. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

#13

(#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc.. upon City Chic Collective Limited waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/24/2022, answer due 5/23/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Jason P. Bloom, Esq. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc.. upon City Chic Collective Limited waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/24/2022, answer due 5/23/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Jason P. Bloom, Esq. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc.. upon Nordstrom, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/24/2022, answer due 5/23/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Jason P. Bloom, Esq. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant City Chic Collective Limited, Nordstrom, Inc. (iv) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #5 . The following error(s) was found: Please put the Central District of California. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (ghap) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff KLAUBER BROTHERS, INC. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by KLAUBER BROTHERS, INC. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff KLAUBER BROTHERS, INC, identifying CITY CHIC COLLECTIVE LIMITED and NORDSTROM, INC.. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff KLAUBER BROTHERS, INC. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32957754 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff KLAUBER BROTHERS, INC. (Attorney Scott A. Burroughs added to party KLAUBER BROTHERS, INC(pty:pla))(Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nordstrom, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Klauber Brothers, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kelsey Marie Schultz

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Trevor William Barrett