This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/18/2022 at 07:25:35 (UTC).

Klauber Brothers, Inc. v. G.S.L., Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/17/2022 Klauber Brothers, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against G S L , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha and Maria A. Audero. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00345

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha

Referral Judge

Maria A. Audero

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Klauber Brothers, Inc.

Defendants

G.S.L., Inc.

DOES 1 through 10

G.S.L., Inc. individually and a California Corporation doing business as City Studio

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Scott A. Burroughs

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Stephen M. Doniger

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Trevor William Barrett

Attorney at Doninger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32632611 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc.. (Attorney Scott A. Burroughs added to party Klauber Brothers, Inc.(pty:pla))(Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 01/17/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 01/17/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc., identifying G.S.L., INC.. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 01/17/2022)

#4

(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Klauber Brothers, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 01/17/2022)

#5

(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 01/17/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (et) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#8

(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#9

(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant G.S.L., Inc. (et) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#10

(#10) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf) (Entered: 01/23/2022)

#11

(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc., upon Defendant G.S.L., Inc. served on 1/20/2022, answer due 2/10/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Timothy Francis Loustalot, Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

#13

(#13) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc.to Text Only Scheduling Notice,,, 12 (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

#16

(#16) NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Text Only Scheduling Notice 15 Is duplicative of CM/ECF docket entry no. 14. (lc) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

17 #17

Main Document

17 #1

Proposed Order

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE OF DOE AMENDMENT NAMING JODI KRISTOPHER, LLC AS DOE 1 filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Text Only Scheduling Notice 15 Is duplicative of CM/ECF docket entry no. 14. (lc) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER By Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: On February 24, 2022, the court ordered Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc. ("Plaintiff") to show cause ("OSC") why the action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (Dkt. 12 ). Plaintiff responded timely on March 2, 2022, stating it had served the incorrect entity and requesting additional time to add an entity as a defendant in the action and to complete service on the correct Defendants. (Dkt. #13 ). Having reviewed Plaintiff's response and finding good cause therefor, the court CONTINUES Plaintiff's deadline to respond to the OSC to April 18, 2022. The filing of an amended complaint or corrected proofs of service on or before April 18, 2022 will qualify as a sufficient response. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tf) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: On February 24, 2022, the court ordered Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc. ("Plaintiff") to show cause ("OSC") why the action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (Dkt. 12 ). Plaintiff responded timely on March 2, 2022, stating it had served the incorrect entity and requesting additional time to add an entity as a defendant in the action and to complete service on the correct Defendants. (Dkt. #13 ). Having reviewed Plaintiff's response and finding good cause therefor, the court CONTINUES Plaintiff's deadline to respond to the OSC to April 18, 2022. The filing of an amended complaint or corrected proofs of service on or before April 18, 2022 will qualify as a sufficient response. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tf) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc.to Text Only Scheduling Notice,,, 12 (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • Docket(#12) (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION AS TO DEFENDANT G.S.L., Inc. by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: The court, on its own motion, orders Plaintiff to show cause in writing no later than March 3, 2022, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. Pursuant to Rule 55 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff shall file an application requesting the entry of default. Plaintiff is advised that the Court will consider the filing of an application, which complies with the federal rules, on or before the date upon which the response is due, as a satisfactory response to the Order to Show Cause. The Order to Show Cause will stand submitted upon the filing of an appropriate response. No oral argument will be heard unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Failure to respond will result in the dismissal of this matter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tf) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc., upon Defendant G.S.L., Inc. served on 1/20/2022, answer due 2/10/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Timothy Francis Loustalot, Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf) (Entered: 01/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant G.S.L., Inc. (et) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (et) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 01/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Klauber Brothers, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 01/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc., identifying G.S.L., INC.. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 01/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 01/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32632611 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc.. (Attorney Scott A. Burroughs added to party Klauber Brothers, Inc.(pty:pla))(Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 01/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where G S L A L L C is a litigant

Latest cases where Klauber Brothers, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Trevor William Barrett

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott A Burroughs