This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/16/2019 at 07:10:43 (UTC).

Klauber Brothers, Inc. v. Forever 21, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/17/2019 Klauber Brothers, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Forever 21, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jacqueline Chooljian and Philip S. Gutierrez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-05287

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jacqueline Chooljian

Presiding Judge

Philip S. Gutierrez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Klauber Brothers, Inc.

Defendants

Does 1 through 10

Forever 21, Inc.

Love Vintage, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Scott A Burroughs

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs APC

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Stephen M Doniger

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Trevor William Barrett

Attorney at Doninger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Justin M Gomes

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

13 #1

Proposed Order

#14

#15

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc., upon Defendant Love Vintage, Inc. served on 7/5/2019, answer due 7/26/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Soo J Kim, Authorized Agent c/o Octavio Reyes, Employee Authorized to Accept in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER ON REQUEST TO REOPEN CASE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez granting #13 REQUEST: FOR GOOD CAUSE APPEARING, THE FOLLOWING IS HEREBY ORDERED: The case is hereby reopened in its entirety. Defendants Forever 21, Inc. and Love Vintage, Inc. will file their Answers on August 16, 2019. (bm) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) REQUEST to Reopen Case filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Burroughs, Scott) Modified on 8/6/2019 (bm). (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT; ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, re Notice of Settlement #11 : IT IS SO ORDERED. (bm) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc., upon Defendant Forever 21, Inc. served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Registered Agent c/o Carlos Paz in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Forever 21, Inc., Love Vintage, Inc. (lh) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (lh) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Klauber Brothers, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc., (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23935142 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc.. (Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Klauber Brothers, Inc.(pty:pla))(Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOVE VINTAGE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Klauber Brothers, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where FOREVER 21 INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Trevor William Barrett