This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/08/2022 at 08:55:42 (UTC).

Klauber Brothers, Inc. v. Aeropostale, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/09/2022 Klauber Brothers, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Aeropostale, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is J. Paul Oetken. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01993

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Paul Oetken

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Klauber Brothers, Inc.

Defendants

Aeropostale, Inc.

Walmart, Inc.

Fashion Republic Inc. dba Tags Weekly

Transform SR Holding Management LLC dba Sears

Amazon.Com, Inc.

Does 1 Through 10

Fashion Republic Inc. individually doing business as Tags Weekly, an Oregon corporation

Transform SR Holding Management LLC individually doing business as Sears, a Delaware limited liabilty company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott Alan Burroughs

Attorney at Doniger / Burroughs

603 Rose Ave

Venice, CA 90291

Defendant Attorneys

Anthony F. Lo Cicero

Attorney at Amster, Rothstein & Ebenstein LLC

90 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10016

James Edward Geringer

Attorney at Klarquist Sparkman, LLP

121 Sw Salmon St., Suite 1600

Portland, OR 97204

Cory Jay Rosenbaum

Attorney at Rosenbaum Famularo & Segall P.C.

138 E Park Avenue, Ste B

Long Beach, NY 11561

 

Court Documents

#1

(#12) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Anthony F. Lo Cicero dated April 22, 2022. Document filed by Walmart, Inc...(Lo Cicero, Anthony) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

#2

(#2) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

#4

(#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Klauber Brothers, Inc...(Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Aeropostale Inc., Walmart, Inc., Fashion Republic Inc. dba Tags Weekly, Transform SR Holding Management LLC, dba Sears, Amazon.com, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Klauber Brothers, Inc...(Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

#6

No Description Available

#7

No Description Available

#8

No Description Available

#9

No Description Available

#10

No Description Available

#11

(#11) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Walmart, Inc...(Lo Cicero, Anthony) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

#12

(#12) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Anthony F. Lo Cicero dated April 22, 2022. Document filed by Walmart, Inc...(Lo Cicero, Anthony) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

#14

(#14) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Scott Burroughs dated April 22, 2022. Document filed by Klauber Brothers, Inc...(Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

#16

(#16) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Aeropostale, Inc. served on 4/22/2022, answer due 5/13/2022. Service was accepted by Corporation Service Company - Registered Agent for Service of Process. Document filed by Klauber Brothers, Inc...(Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

#17

(#17) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Cory J. Rosenbaum dated May 3, 2022. Document filed by Does 1 Through 10..(Rosenbaum, Cory) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

#19

(#19) FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from James E. Geringer dated May 5, 2022. Document filed by Amazon.Com, Inc...(Geringer, James) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER granting #19 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: GRANTED. DEFENDANT AMAZON SHALL MOVE, ANSWER, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND ON OR BEFORE 5/25/22. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (brl) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from James E. Geringer dated May 5, 2022. Document filed by Amazon.Com, Inc...(Geringer, James) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER granting #17 Letter Motion for Extension of Time: GRANTED. DEFENDANT TAGS WEEKLY SHALL MOVE, ANSWER, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 5/25/2022. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (brl) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Cory J. Rosenbaum dated May 3, 2022. Document filed by Does 1 Through 10..(Rosenbaum, Cory) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Aeropostale, Inc. served on 4/22/2022, answer due 5/13/2022. Service was accepted by Corporation Service Company - Registered Agent for Service of Process. Document filed by Klauber Brothers, Inc...(Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER granting #14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #14 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer: GRANTED. DEFENDANT TRANSFORM SHALL ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 5/25/2022. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (brl) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Scott Burroughs dated April 22, 2022. Document filed by Klauber Brothers, Inc...(Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting #12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer: GRANTED. DEFENDANT WALMART INC. SHALL ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 5/25/2022. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (brl) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Anthony F. Lo Cicero dated April 22, 2022. Document filed by Walmart, Inc...(Lo Cicero, Anthony) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Walmart, Inc...(Lo Cicero, Anthony) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/10/2022
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Scott Alan Burroughs. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Scott Alan Burroughs. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Aeropostale, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., Fashion Republic Inc. dba Tags Weekly, Transform SR Holding Management LLC dba Sears, Walmart, Inc... The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; alias party name was omitted;. (pc) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Aeropostale Inc., Walmart, Inc., Fashion Republic Inc. dba Tags Weekly, Transform SR Holding Management LLC, dba Sears, Amazon.com, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Klauber Brothers, Inc...(Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Klauber Brothers, Inc...(Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Aeropostale, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., Does 1 Through 10, Fashion Republic Inc. dba Tags Weekly, Transform SR Holding Management LLC dba Sears, Walmart, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25840421)Document filed by Klauber Brothers, Inc...(Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRANSFORM SR LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Klauber Brothers, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Aeropostale Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant