This case was last updated from PACER on 03/12/2021 at 20:23:55 (UTC).

KKMB, LLC v. Khader et al

Case Summary

On 09/10/2020 KKMB, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Khader. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Justin S. Anand and J. P. Boulee. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-MI-00105

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Justin S. Anand

Presiding Judge

J. P. Boulee

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KKMB, LLC

Petitioner

Habersham Funding, LLC

Defendants

Sandra Rabadi

Does 1 through 20

Noura Shoubash

Nadia Shoubash Kort

ABE Financial Services, Inc.

Reem J. Rabadi

Abraham Mattar Khader

Jason Boutros, M.D.

Jason K. Boutros, M.D., Inc.

Hanna Bishara Hirezi

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Kimberly A. Worth

Attorney at Worth Jarrell LLC

Five Concourse Parkway, Suite 3200

Atlanta, GA 30328

Jose Ignacio Rojas

Attorney at Rojas Law

200 South Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 2790

Miami, FL 33131

Defendant Attorneys

Mark Hardiman

Attorney at Nelson Hardiman, LLP - LA CA

1100 Glendon Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Lauren Ann Warner

Attorney at Chilivis, Grubman, Dalbey & Warner, LLP

3127 Maple Drive, Ne, 30305

Atlanta, GA 30305

 

Court Documents

5 #2

Exhibit A-1 Exchanges

5 #1

Exhibit A-Declaration

#5

(#5) RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena With Memorandum of Law filed by Jason Boutros, MD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration, #2 Exhibit A-1 Exchanges)(Warner, Lauren) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/20. (eop) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

1 #7

Exhibit -Cover Letter

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit -E -Original Subpoena

1 #4

Exhibit -D -Correspondence Regarding Objections

1 #3

Exhibit -C -Order on Sanctions

1 #2

Exhibit -BDismissal and Order

1 #1

Exhibit -A -Ameneded Subpoena

#1

(#1) MOTION to Quash Amended Subpoena by Habersham Funding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -Ameneded Subpoena, #2 Exhibit -BDismissal and Order, #3 Exhibit -C -Order on Sanctions, #4 Exhibit -D -Correspondence Regarding Objections, #5 Exhibit -E -Original Subpoena, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Exhibit -Cover Letter)(eop) Modified text on 9/11/2020 (eop). (Entered: 09/11/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous Case Terminated. Make all future filings in 1:20-cv-3997-JPB-JSA. (adg) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena With Memorandum of Law filed by Jason Boutros, MD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration, #2 Exhibit A-1 Exchanges)(Warner, Lauren) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPLICATION for Admission of Mark Hardiman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10182642).by Jason Boutros, MD. (Warner, Lauren) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #3 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 9/16/20. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bnw) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #3 APPLICATION for Admission of Jose Ignacio Rojas Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10135470).. Attorney Jose Ignacio Rojas added appearing on behalf of Habersham Funding, LLC (nmb) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPLICATION for Admission of Jose Ignacio Rojas Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10135470).by Habersham Funding, LLC. (Worth, Kimberly) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #1 MOTION to Quash Amended Subpoena, to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (eop) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/20. (eop) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid: $ 47.00, receipt number AGANDC-10128677 (eop) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION to Quash Amended Subpoena by Habersham Funding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -Ameneded Subpoena, #2 Exhibit -BDismissal and Order, #3 Exhibit -C -Order on Sanctions, #4 Exhibit -D -Correspondence Regarding Objections, #5 Exhibit -E -Original Subpoena, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Exhibit -Cover Letter)(eop) Modified text on 9/11/2020 (eop). (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Habersham Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where JASON BOUTROS M.D. INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ABE FINANCIAL SERVICES INC. is a litigant