This case was last updated from PACER on 12/30/2019 at 07:55:57 (UTC).

KK-PB Financial, LLC v. 160 Royal Palm, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/31/2019 KK-PB Financial, LLC filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against 160 Royal Palm, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dave Lee Brannon and Donald M. Middlebrooks. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:19-CV-81483

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Dave Lee Brannon

Presiding Judge

Donald M. Middlebrooks

 

Party Details

Appellant

KK-PB Financial, LLC

Appellee

160 Royal Palm, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

John Kennedy Cunningham

Attorney at White & Case LLP

200 South Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 4900

Miami, FL 33131

James Nial Robinson, II

Attorney at White & Case LLP

200 South Biscayne Blvd., Suite 4900

Miami, FL 33131-2352

Fan B He

Attorney at White & Case LLP

200 South Biscayne Blvd., Suite 4900

Miami, FL 33131

Appellee Attorneys

Eric Scott Pendergraft

Attorney at Shraiberg, Landau & Page, PA

2385 N.W. Executive Center Drive, Suite 300

Boca Raton, FL 33431

Philip Joseph Landau

Attorney at Shraiberg, Landau & Page, P.A.

2385 Nw Executive Center Drive, Suite 300

Boca Raton, FL 33431

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by 160 Royal Palm, LLC (Landau, Philip) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

2 #1

Docket Sheet

#2

(#2) Bankruptcy Transmittal of re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by KK-PB Financial, LLC (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(mon) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER Closing Case. The Clerk of Court CLOSE THIS CASE and DENY all pending motions AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 11/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

#1

(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (received), Bankruptcy Court case number 18-19441-BKC-EPK, filed by KK-PB Financial, LLC.(mon) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal /JOINT NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF APPEAL by KK-PB Financial, LLC (Robinson, James) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER Closing Case. The Clerk of Court CLOSE THIS CASE and DENY all pending motions AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 11/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal /JOINT NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF APPEAL by KK-PB Financial, LLC (Robinson, James) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by 160 Royal Palm, LLC (Landau, Philip) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • (#4) Clerk's Notice to Parties Re Administrative Order 2015-9 and Amendments to Federal Bankruptcy Rules and Local Rule 87.4 Re Processing of Bankruptcy Appeals (jc) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • (#3) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jc) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Bankruptcy Transmittal of re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by KK-PB Financial, LLC (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(mon) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (received), Bankruptcy Court case number 18-19441-BKC-EPK, filed by KK-PB Financial, LLC.(mon) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less