This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/29/2019 at 08:31:07 (UTC).

Kitts v. Cashco, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/30/2019 Kitts filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Cashco, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Kirtan Khalsa and Robert C. Brack. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00800

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kirtan Khalsa

Presiding Judge

Robert C. Brack

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Matthew Kitts

Defendants

HiTex, LLC

Budget Payday Loans Limited Partnership

Cashco, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher L. Graeser

Attorney at The Graeser Law Firm

3600 Cerrillos Road, Suite 719-F

Santa Fe, NM 87507-2695

Rob Treinen

Attorney at Treinen Law Office

500 Tijeras Ave Nw

Albuquerque, NM 87102

John B. Hiatt

Po Box 220

Santa Fe, NM 87504

Defendant Attorneys

Stephen P. Curtis

Attorney at Stephen P Curtis Attorney at Law PC

6747 Academy Road Ne, Suite D

Albuquerque, NM 87109

George D. Giddens, Jr.

10400 Academy Rd Ne, Suite 350

Albuquerque, NM 87111

 

Court Documents

24 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#24

#23

#21

#20

12 #7

Exhibit G

12 #6

Exhibit F

12 #4

Exhibit D

#11

5 #10

Supplement

5 #9

Supplement

5 #4

Supplement

5 #3

Supplement

#5

#4

#3

1 #1

Exhibit Pleadings

#1

57 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Budget Payday Loans Limited Partnership, Cashco, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Sedillo, Marcus) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by HiTex, LLC. (Curtis, Stephen) (Entered: 10/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 15. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER Granting Extension of Time by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Defendant HiTex may file a response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand no later than October 28, 2019. (kys) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION for Extension of Time to File , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court by HiTex, LLC. (Curtis, Stephen) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • Docket(#19) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Matthew Kitts re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #12 Memorandum in Support, (Treinen, Rob) (Entered: 10/14/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by George D. Giddens, Jr on behalf of Budget Payday Loans Limited Partnership, Cashco, Inc. (Giddens, George) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE by HiTex, LLC re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Curtis, Stephen) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 10 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (khs)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Transmittal of State Court Documents by Cashco, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Supplement) (Curtis, Stephen) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Transmittal of State Court Documents by Cashco, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement, #4 Supplement, #5 Supplement, #6 Supplement, #7 Supplement, #8 Supplement, #9 Supplement, #10 Supplement, #11 Supplement, #12 Supplement, #13 Supplement) (Curtis, Stephen) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Transmittal of State Court Documents by Cashco, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement, #4 Supplement, #5 Supplement, #6 Supplement, #7 Supplement, #8 Supplement, #9 Supplement, #10 Supplement) (Curtis, Stephen) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Transmittal of State Court Documents by Cashco, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement, #4 Supplement, #5 Supplement, #6 Supplement, #7 Supplement, #8 Supplement, #9 Supplement, #10 Supplement) (Curtis, Stephen) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Joint Status Report due by 10/4/2019. Telephonic Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/15/2019 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Counsel are to call Judge Khalsa's AT&T conference line (877) 848-7030 and enter Code: 7324132 to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 10/10/2019. (kys) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6645844 re #1 Notice of Removal filed by HiTex, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Curtis, Stephen) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET by HiTex, LLC ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by HiTex, LLC. (Curtis, Stephen) Modified docket text on 9/3/2019 (ln). (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • Docket(#2) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • DocketUnited States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (ln) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by HiTex, LLC from Second Judicial District Court of New Mexico, case number D-202-CV-2016-01851. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by HiTex, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pleadings)(Curtis, Stephen) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CASHCO, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rob Treinen