This case was last updated from PACER on 11/02/2020 at 09:56:19 (UTC).

Kittrell v. Performance Transportation, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/03/2020 Kittrell filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Performance Transportation, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are F. Keith Ball and Carlton W. Reeves. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00591

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

F. Keith Ball

Presiding Judge

Carlton W. Reeves

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Billy Kittrell

Defendants

Vistar Transportation, LLC a foreign limited liability company doing business as Vistar

Performance Transportation, LLC a foreign limited liability company doing business as Performance Food Group

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Justin L. Smith

Attorney at CROSS & SMITH, LLC

907 17Th Avenue

Tuscaloosa, AL 35401

Defendant Attorneys

Arthur D. Spratlin, Jr.

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW LLP-Ridgeland

P. O. Box 6010, 1020 Highland Colony Pkwy., Ste. 1400 (39157)

Ridgeland, MS 39158-6010

Keishunna R. Webster

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW LLP-Ridgeland

P. O. Box 6010, 1020 Highland Colony Pkwy., Ste. 1400 (39157)

Ridgeland, MS 39158-6010

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Disclosure due by 11/23/2020; Jury Trial set for a two-week term of court commencing 12/6/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5B (Jackson) Reeves before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves; Pretrial Conference set for 11/5/2021, time to be determined, in Chambers 5.550 (Jackson) Reeves before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves; Discovery due by 6/22/2021; Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 11/30/2020; Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 11/30/2020; Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 3/23/2021; Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 4/22/2021; Motions due by 7/6/2021; Settlement Conference set for 9/16/2021 09:00 AM in Chambers 5.150 (Jackson) Ball before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. Seven (7) days before the settlement conference, the parties must submit via e-mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov an updated CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT MEMORANDUM. All parties, including a person with full settlement authority, are required to be present at the conference unless excused by the Court. If a party believes the scheduled settlement conference would not be productive and should be cancelled, the party is directed to inform the Court via e-mail of the grounds for their belief at least seven (7) days prior to the conference. ADR Report due by 10/29/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 10/29/2020. (JEJ) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

#9

(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Vistar Transportation, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Performance Food Group, Inc., Corporate Parent PFST Holding Co. for Vistar Transportation, LLC. (Spratlin, Arthur) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#8

(#8) Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/27/2020 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

#7

(#7) AGREED ORDER of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF Performance Transportation, LLC d/b/a Performance Food Group without prejudice. The parties shall bear their respective fees and costs. Performance Transportation, LLC (a foreign limited liability company)terminated. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 10/1/20 (TRS) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Keishunna R. Webster on behalf of Vistar Transportation, LLC (Webster, Keishunna) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Vistar Transportation, LLC.(Spratlin, Arthur) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

#4

(#4) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF Receipt filed by Billy Kittrell. (Smith, Justin) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

#3

(#3) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF Receipt filed by Billy Kittrell. (Smith, Justin) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Performance Transportation, LLC, Vistar Transportation, LLC. (LAT) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Performance Transportation, LLC, Vistar Transportation, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4364766), filed by Billy Kittrell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Disclosure due by 11/23/2020; Jury Trial set for a two-week term of court commencing 12/6/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5B (Jackson) Reeves before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves; Pretrial Conference set for 11/5/2021, time to be determined, in Chambers 5.550 (Jackson) Reeves before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves; Discovery due by 6/22/2021; Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 11/30/2020; Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 11/30/2020; Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 3/23/2021; Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 4/22/2021; Motions due by 7/6/2021; Settlement Conference set for 9/16/2021 09:00 AM in Chambers 5.150 (Jackson) Ball before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. Seven (7) days before the settlement conference, the parties must submit via e-mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov an updated CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT MEMORANDUM. All parties, including a person with full settlement authority, are required to be present at the conference unless excused by the Court. If a party believes the scheduled settlement conference would not be productive and should be cancelled, the party is directed to inform the Court via e-mail of the grounds for their belief at least seven (7) days prior to the conference. ADR Report due by 10/29/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 10/29/2020. (JEJ) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 10/27/2020 in Jackson, MS. Appearing: Justin Smith, Art Spratlin and Keishunna Webster. (JEJ) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Vistar Transportation, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Performance Food Group, Inc., Corporate Parent PFST Holding Co. for Vistar Transportation, LLC. (Spratlin, Arthur) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/27/2020 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AGREED ORDER of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF Performance Transportation, LLC d/b/a Performance Food Group without prejudice. The parties shall bear their respective fees and costs. Performance Transportation, LLC (a foreign limited liability company)terminated. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 10/1/20 (TRS) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Keishunna R. Webster on behalf of Vistar Transportation, LLC (Webster, Keishunna) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Vistar Transportation, LLC.(Spratlin, Arthur) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF Receipt filed by Billy Kittrell. (Smith, Justin) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF Receipt filed by Billy Kittrell. (Smith, Justin) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Performance Transportation, LLC, Vistar Transportation, LLC. (LAT) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Performance Transportation, LLC, Vistar Transportation, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4364766), filed by Billy Kittrell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less