This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/18/2022 at 07:28:03 (UTC).

Kitsap County v. McKinsey & Company Inc United States et al

Case Summary

On 11/19/2021 Kitsap County filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against McKinsey Company Inc United States. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Benjamin H. Settle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-05853

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Benjamin H. Settle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kitsap County

Defendants

McKinsey & Company Inc United States

McKinsey & Company Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David J Ko

Attorney at KELLER ROHRBACK LLP (WA)

1201 3Rd Ave, Ste 3200

Seattle, WA 98101-3052

Gretchen Freeman Cappio

Attorney at KELLER ROHRBACK LLP (WA)

1201 3Rd Ave, Ste 3200

Seattle, WA 98101-3052

Lynn Lincoln Sarko

Attorney at KELLER ROHRBACK LLP (WA)

1201 3Rd Ave, Ste 3200

Seattle, WA 98101-3052

Matthew M. Gerend

Attorney at KELLER ROHRBACK LLP (WA)

1201 3Rd Ave, Ste 3200

Seattle, WA 98101-3052

Christine M. Palmer

Attorney at KITSAP COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE

614 Division St, Ms-35A

Port Orchard, WA 98366-7148

Daniel P Mensher

Attorney at KELLER ROHRBACK LLP (WA)

1201 3Rd Ave, Ste 3200

Seattle, WA 98101-3052

Derek W Loeser

Attorney at KELLER ROHRBACK LLP (WA)

1201 3Rd Ave, Ste 3200

Seattle, WA 98101-3052

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Related Case(s) N.D. Cal. 3:21-md-02996-CRB, by Plaintiff Kitsap County. (Ko, David) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) McKinsey & Company Inc, McKinsey & Company Inc United States. (RE) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 2/22/2022, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 2/7/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/14/2022. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (DK) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant McKinsey & Company Inc mailed on 11/22/2021; McKinsey & Company Inc United States mailed on 11/22/2021 (Ko, David) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

6 #6

Main Document

6 #1

CTO email

#7

(#7) TRANSFERRED CASE opened in California Northern District as case 3:21cv09837 on 12/20/2021. (LH) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) TRANSFERRED CASE opened in California Northern District as case 3:21cv09837 on 12/20/2021. (LH) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketCase transferred to the Northen District of California by electronic case transfer on 12/20/2021. (LH) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MDL 2996 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 19); in re McKinsey & Company, Inc., National Prescription Opiate Consultant Litigation; transferred to the Northern District of California; assigned to Judge Breyer. (Attachments: #1 CTO email) (LH) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant McKinsey & Company Inc mailed on 11/22/2021; McKinsey & Company Inc United States mailed on 11/22/2021 (Ko, David) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 2/22/2022, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 2/7/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/14/2022. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (DK) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) McKinsey & Company Inc, McKinsey & Company Inc United States. (RE) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE TO FILER: ***Case Terminated-Incorrect Division*** Civil case number 2:21-cv-01564 has been terminated. The incorrect divisional office was selected by the filer upon case opening. This case has now been assigned a Tacoma case number. All future filings shall bear the following case number: 3:21-cv-05853-BHS. Before initiating a new case, please review the #Attorney Case Opening Guide (PDF) to determine the correct divisional jurisdiction. (RE) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Related Case(s) N.D. Cal. 3:21-md-02996-CRB, by Plaintiff Kitsap County. (Ko, David) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) McKinsey & Company Inc, McKinsey & Company Inc United States with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7340578), filed by Kitsap County. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Ko, David) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kitsap County is a litigant

Latest cases where MCKINSEY & COMPANY, INC. UNITED STATES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Michael Gerend

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christine M. Palmer