This case was last updated from PACER on 11/17/2020 at 10:04:01 (UTC).

KITOV PHARMA LTD. v. LUPIN LIMITED et al

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 KITOV PHARMA LTD filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against LUPIN LIMITED. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark Falk and Claire C. Cecchi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-12849

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Mark Falk

Presiding Judge

Claire C. Cecchi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

KITOV PHARMA LTD.

Defendants and Counter Claimants

LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

LUPIN LIMITED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

HARVEY BARTLE, IV

Attorney at MORGAN LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLP

502 Carnegie Center

Princeton, NJ 08540

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

JAMES S. RICHTER

Attorney at MIDLIGE RICHTER LLC

645 Martinsville Road

Basking Ridge, NJ 07920

 

Court Documents

#27

(#27) LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 1/12/2021 11:30 AM before Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 11/16/20. (LM, ) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

#26

(#26) Corporate Disclosure Statement by LUPIN LIMITED, LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (RICHTER, JAMES) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

#25

(#25) ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against KITOV PHARMA LTD. by LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., LUPIN LIMITED.(RICHTER, JAMES) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

#24

(#24) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Guylaine Hache, PhD. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-11544412.) (RICHTER, JAMES) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

#23

(#23) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Joseph M. Janusz to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-11544406.) (RICHTER, JAMES) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

#22

(#22) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jitendra Malik, PhD. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-11544387.) (RICHTER, JAMES) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

#21

(#21) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Lance A. Soderstrom to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-11544374.) (RICHTER, JAMES) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

#20

(#20) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Deepro R. Mukerjee to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-11544351.) (RICHTER, JAMES) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

#19

(#19) ORDER Granting Admission of Counsel Pro Hac Vice as to Deepro R. Mukerjee, Lance A. Soderstrom, Jitendra Malik, PhD., Joseph M. Janusz and Guylaine Hach, PhD., etc. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 10/21/20. (jc, ) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS ISSUED as to LUPIN LIMITED, LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#4

(#4) AO120 Patent Form filed. (mg) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by HARVEY BARTLE, IV on behalf of KITOV PHARMA LTD. (BARTLE, HARVEY) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by KITOV PHARMA LTD.. (BARTLE, HARVEY) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

1 #4

AO120 Patent/Trademark Form

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against LUPIN LIMITED, LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11376316), filed by KITOV PHARMA LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form)(BARTLE, HARVEY) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 1/12/2021 11:30 AM before Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 11/16/20. (LM, ) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Corporate Disclosure Statement by LUPIN LIMITED, LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (RICHTER, JAMES) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against KITOV PHARMA LTD. by LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., LUPIN LIMITED.(RICHTER, JAMES) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketPro Hac Vice counsel, DEEPRO R. MUKERJEE, LANCE A. SODERSTROM, JITENDRA MALIK, JOSEPH M. JANUSZ and GUYLAINE HACHE, have been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jc, ) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Guylaine Hache, PhD. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-11544412.) (RICHTER, JAMES) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Joseph M. Janusz to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-11544406.) (RICHTER, JAMES) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jitendra Malik, PhD. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-11544387.) (RICHTER, JAMES) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Lance A. Soderstrom to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-11544374.) (RICHTER, JAMES) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Deepro R. Mukerjee to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-11544351.) (RICHTER, JAMES) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER Granting Admission of Counsel Pro Hac Vice as to Deepro R. Mukerjee, Lance A. Soderstrom, Jitendra Malik, PhD., Joseph M. Janusz and Guylaine Hach, PhD., etc. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 10/21/20. (jc, ) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2020
  • Docket(#8) TEXT ORDER REALLOCATING AND REASSIGNING CASE. Case Number 3:20-cv-12849. Case reallocated to Newark and reassigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk for all further proceedings. Judge Michael A. Shipp, Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 9/24/2020. (jjc, ) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketText Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael A. Shipp: Pursuant to Local Patent Rule 1.5 Patent Pilot Project, case shall be reassigned to a designated patent judge. (gxh) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by KITOV PHARMA LTD.. LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (BARTLE, HARVEY) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by KITOV PHARMA LTD.. LUPIN LIMITED served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (BARTLE, HARVEY) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS ISSUED as to LUPIN LIMITED, LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AO120 Patent Form filed. (mg) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketJudge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi added. (mg) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by HARVEY BARTLE, IV on behalf of KITOV PHARMA LTD. (BARTLE, HARVEY) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by KITOV PHARMA LTD.. (BARTLE, HARVEY) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against LUPIN LIMITED, LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11376316), filed by KITOV PHARMA LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form)(BARTLE, HARVEY) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less