This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 18:21:20 (UTC).

Kitchen v. Four Seasons Hotels Limited

Case Summary

On 09/26/2019 Kitchen filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Four Seasons Hotels Limited. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Hawaii District. The Judge overseeing this case is WES REBER PORTER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00517

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hawaii District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WES REBER PORTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

James H. Kitchen

Susan R. Kitchen

Defendants

Four Seasons Hotels Limited

Jane Does 1-10

John Does 1-10

Doe Governmental Entities 1-10

Doe Corporations 1-10

Doe Non-Profit Entities 1-10

Doe Partnerships 1-10

Four Seasons Hotels Limited doing business as Four Seasons Resort Hualalai

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jon S. Jacobs

Attorney at Law Office of Jon S. Jacobs, LLLC

733 Bishop Street, Suite 1872

Honolulu, HI 96813

Defendant Attorneys

Stacy Y Ma

Attorney at Goodsill Anderson Quinn & Stifel LLLP

999 Bishop St Ste 1600

Honolulu, HI 96813

Patricia M. NaPier

Attorney at Goodsill Anderson Quinn & Stifel LLLP

999 Bishop St Ste 1600, 547-5600

Honolulu, HI 96813

Rachel Anna Zelman

Attorney at Goodsill Anderson Quinn & Stifel LLLP

999 Bishop St Ste 1600

Honolulu, HI 96813

Calvin E. Young

Attorney at Goodsill Anderson Quinn & Stifel LLLP

999 Bishop St Ste 1600, 547-5600, Fax: 547-5880

Honolulu, HI 96813

 

Court Documents

#33

(#33) NOTICE by Four Seasons Hotels Limited Defendant Four Seasons Hotels Limited's Notice of Withdrawal of Notice of Taking Deposition Upon Oral Examination Four Seasons Hotels Limited re #28 . (Ma, Stacy) Modified on 4/22/2020 to add linkage to ECF No. #28 (emt, ). (Entered: 04/20/2020)

#32

(#32) FIRST STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT'S EXPERT DISCLOSURES AND AMEND APRIL 13, 2020 SCHEDULING ORDER (DKT. NO. #31 ); ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 4/15/2020. (emt, ) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

#31

(#31) AMENDED RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 4/13/2020. (emt, ) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

#30

(#30) EO: Based on #29 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL DATES AND DEADLINES, Non-Jury Trial set for 10/27/2020 is CONTINUED to 1/12/2021. An Amended Rule 16 Scheduling Order to be issued. Non-Jury Trial is set for 1/12/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 12/30/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Settlement Conference is set for 10/01/2020 at 10:00 AM in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Settlement Conference statements by 09/24/2020. Dispositive Motions filed by 8/12/2020. Discovery due by 10/6/2020; all discovery motions and conferences addressed by 11/03/2020. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

#29

(#29) STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL DATES AND DEADLINES - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 4/13/2020. (emt, ) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

#28

(#28) NOTICE by Four Seasons Hotels Limited Defendant Four Seasons Hotels Limited's Notice of Taking Deposition Upon Oral Examination [James H. Kitchen; Susan R. Kitchen] Four Seasons Hotels Limited. (Ma, Stacy) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

#26

(#26) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Four Seasons Hotels Limited (Re: Defendant Four Seasons Hotels Limited's Response to Plaintiffs' First Request for Answers to Interrogatories, Dated November 14, 2019) (Zelman, Rachel) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

#25

(#25) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Four Seasons Hotels Limited (Re: Defendant Four Seasons Hotels Limited's Response to Plaintiffs' First Request for Production of Documents and Things, Dated November 14, 2019) (Zelman, Rachel) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

#24

(#24) NOTICE by Four Seasons Hotels Limited Withdrawal of Patricia M. NaPier and Appearance of Calvin E. Young; Certificate of Service Four Seasons Hotels Limited. (Young, Calvin) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

5 #1

Election Form: Consent to Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Attachments: #1 Election Form: Consent to Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge) ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and filing it with the court no later than twenty-one (21) days after entry of appearance. In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. (emt, ) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

4 #1

Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements

#4

(#4) Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 10/28/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, ) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Four Seasons Hotels Limited identifying Corporate Parent Four Seasons Holdings Inc. for Four Seasons Hotels Limited.. (NaPier, Patricia) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Certificate of Service

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Four Seasons Hotels Limited from Third Circuit Court, case number Civil No. 19-1-181K. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2268405), filed by Four Seasons Hotels Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Complaint; CV 19-1-181K) , #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ma, Stacy) Modified on 9/26/2019 (emt, ). (Entered: 09/26/2019)

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE by Four Seasons Hotels Limited Defendant Four Seasons Hotels Limited's Notice of Withdrawal of Notice of Taking Deposition Upon Oral Examination Four Seasons Hotels Limited re #28 . (Ma, Stacy) Modified on 4/22/2020 to add linkage to ECF No. #28 (emt, ). (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) FIRST STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT'S EXPERT DISCLOSURES AND AMEND APRIL 13, 2020 SCHEDULING ORDER (DKT. NO. #31 ); ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 4/15/2020. (emt, ) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) AMENDED RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 4/13/2020. (emt, ) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) EO: Based on #29 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL DATES AND DEADLINES, Non-Jury Trial set for 10/27/2020 is CONTINUED to 1/12/2021. An Amended Rule 16 Scheduling Order to be issued. Non-Jury Trial is set for 1/12/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 12/30/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Settlement Conference is set for 10/01/2020 at 10:00 AM in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Settlement Conference statements by 09/24/2020. Dispositive Motions filed by 8/12/2020. Discovery due by 10/6/2020; all discovery motions and conferences addressed by 11/03/2020. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL DATES AND DEADLINES - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 4/13/2020. (emt, ) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) NOTICE by Four Seasons Hotels Limited Defendant Four Seasons Hotels Limited's Notice of Taking Deposition Upon Oral Examination [James H. Kitchen; Susan R. Kitchen] Four Seasons Hotels Limited. (Ma, Stacy) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • Docket(#27) EO: To allow more time for parties to complete discovery, all counsel jointly agree and request to continue the Early Settlment. Request is granted. The Early Settlement Conference previously set for 03/13/2020 IS CONTINUED TO 05/14/2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Counsel Stacy Y. Ma to notify the parties. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Four Seasons Hotels Limited (Re: Defendant Four Seasons Hotels Limited's Response to Plaintiffs' First Request for Answers to Interrogatories, Dated November 14, 2019) (Zelman, Rachel) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Four Seasons Hotels Limited (Re: Defendant Four Seasons Hotels Limited's Response to Plaintiffs' First Request for Production of Documents and Things, Dated November 14, 2019) (Zelman, Rachel) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE by Four Seasons Hotels Limited Withdrawal of Patricia M. NaPier and Appearance of Calvin E. Young; Certificate of Service Four Seasons Hotels Limited. (Young, Calvin) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2019
  • (#10) EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED from 10/28/2019 to 10/29/2019 at 9:15 a.m. in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(agh) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Four Seasons Hotels Limited re: First Request for Production of Documents and Things to Plaintiffs James H. Kitchen and Susan R. Kitchen (Ma, Stacy) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Four Seasons Hotels Limited re: First Request For Answers to Interrogatories to Plaintiff Susan R. Kitchen (Ma, Stacy) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Four Seasons Hotels Limited re First Request For Answers to Interrogatories to Plaintiff James H. Kitchen (Ma, Stacy) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to Complaint by Four Seasons Hotels Limited.(Ma, Stacy) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Attachments: #1 Election Form: Consent to Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge) ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and filing it with the court no later than twenty-one (21) days after entry of appearance. In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. (emt, ) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 10/28/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, ) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • (#3) NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00517 WRP on all further pleadings. (emt, ) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Four Seasons Hotels Limited identifying Corporate Parent Four Seasons Holdings Inc. for Four Seasons Hotels Limited.. (NaPier, Patricia) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Four Seasons Hotels Limited from Third Circuit Court, case number Civil No. 19-1-181K. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2268405), filed by Four Seasons Hotels Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Complaint; CV 19-1-181K) , #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ma, Stacy) Modified on 9/26/2019 (emt, ). (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less