This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 15:00:03 (UTC).

Kistner et al v. 3M Company et al

Case Summary

On 06/21/2019 Kistner filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against 3M Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Anna J. Brown and Michael W. Mosman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00975

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Anna J. Brown

Michael W. Mosman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Judi Kistner

Defendants

Foster Wheeler LLC

Georgia-Pacific Consumer Products LP

Ingersoll-Rand Company

Pfizer, Inc.

Air & Liquid Systems Corporation

Warren Pumps LLC

3M Company

Metropolitan Life Insurance Company

A.W. Chesterton Company

General Electric Company

Honeywell International Inc.

Mar-Dustrial Sales, Inc.

C.H. Murphy/Clark-Ullman Incorporated

Bryan Steam LLC

Parker-Hannifin Corporation

Officemax Incorporated

Metalclad Insulation LLC

Georgia-Pacific LLC

Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James Gilbert Nelson

421 Water Avenue Ne Suite 4200

Albany, OR 97321

Charles S. Siegel

Attorney at Waters & Kraus, LLP

3141 Hood St., Suite 700

Dallas, TX 75219

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher S. Marks

Attorney at Tanenbaum Keale LLP

701 Pike Street, Suite 1575

Seattle, WA 98101

Erin Fraser

Attorney at Tanenbaum Keale LLP

701 Pike Street, Suite 1575

Seattle, WA 98101

Rachel T. Reynolds

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

1111 Third Avenue, Suite 2700

Seattle, WA 98101

Mark B. Tuvim

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP

701 Fifth Avenue, Suite 2100

Seattle, WA 98104

Molly McKay Williams

Attorney at Ater Wynne LLP

1331 Nw Lovejoy St., Suite 900

Portland, OR 97209

Kevin J. Craig

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP

701 Fifth Avenue, Suite 2100

Seattle, WA 98104

Allen E. Eraut

Attorney at Rizzo Mattingly & Bosworth, PC

1300 Sw Sixth Avenue, Suite 330

Portland, OR 97201

Nancy M. Erfle

Attorney at Ater Wynne LLP

1331 Nw Lovejoy St., Suite 900

Portland, OR 97209

Sandy K. Hanson

Attorney at Ater Wynne LLP

1331 Nw Lovejoy St., Suite 900

Portland, OR 97209

John M. Silk

Attorney at Wilson Smith Cochran & Dickerson

1215 Fourth Avenue, Suite 1700

Seattle, WA 98161-1007

Kristine Kruger

Attorney at Perkins Coie, LLP (Seattle)

1201 Third Avenue, Suite 4800

Seattle, WA 98101-3099

Bruce M. White

Attorney at White & Associates

Po Box 8223

Portland, OR 97207

Katherine M. Steele

Attorney at Bullivant Houser Bailey, PC (Seattle)

1700 Seventh Ave, Suite 1810

Seattle, WA 98101

Megan S. Cook

Attorney at Bullivant Houser Bailey, PC

300 Pioneer Tower, 888 Sw Fifth Avenue

Portland, OR 97204

George S. Pitcher

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

888 Sw Fifth Avenue, Suite 900

Portland, OR 97204-2025

Adam E. Jones

Attorney at Selman Breitman LLP

111 Sw 5Th Ave.,, Suite 3150

Portland, OR 97204

J. Michael Mattingly

Attorney at Rizzo Mattingly Bosworth PC

1300 Sw Sixth Avenue, Suite 330

Portland, OR 97201

Shaun M. Morgan

Attorney at Rizzo, Mattingly, Bosworth

1300 Sw Sixth Avenue, Suite 330

Portland, OR 97202

7 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#36

#35

#34

#33

#32

#31

30 #4

Exhibit D

30 #3

Exhibit C

30 #2

Exhibit B

#4

3 #2

Exhibit State Court File

3 #1

Exhibit First Amended Complaint

#3

2 #1

Exhibit A - E

#2

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Complaint

#1

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Corporate Disclosure Statement of Pfizer Inc.. Filed by Pfizer, Inc.. (Alkhazov, Marissa) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Notice of Appearance Filed by Pfizer, Inc.. (Alkhazov, Marissa) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Heidi L. Mandt is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Taryn Basauri Filed by Parker-Hannifin Corporation. (Mandt, Heidi) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Notice of Appearance of George S. Pitcher appearing on behalf of C.H. Murphy/Clark-Ullman Incorporated along with Jason Daywitt and Elizabeth D. MacGregor Filed by on behalf of C.H. Murphy/Clark-Ullman Incorporated. (Pitcher, George) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Declaration of Christopher S. Marks . Filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Foster Wheeler LLC. (Related document(s): Response to Motion #31 .) (Marks, Christopher) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Response to Motion to Remand to State Court #30 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Foster Wheeler LLC. (Marks, Christopher) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Motion to Remand to State Court. Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Nelson, James) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Peter J. Mintzer is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Adam E. Jones Filed by Bryan Steam LLC. (Mintzer, Peter) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • Docket(#28) Notification of CM/ECF Account for Charles S. Siegel (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: cssiegel. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Charles S. Siegel for Judi Kistner and Ronald Kistner. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5931318 issued. Signed on 7/22/2019 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (ecp) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by CBS Corporation. (Marks, Christopher) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by General Electric Company. (Marks, Christopher) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by 3M Company. (Hanson, Sandy) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) with Jury Demand . Filed by 3M Company. (Hanson, Sandy) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR MAR-DUSTRIAL SALES, INC. Filed by Mar-Dustrial Sales, Inc.. (Eraut, Allen) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Anna J. Brown to Judge Michael W. Mosman. (eo) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 10/22/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 11/21/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 11/21/2019. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (sb) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Declaration of Christopher S. Marks Enclosing State Court File. Filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Foster Wheeler LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit State Court File) (Marks, Christopher) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Declaration of Christopher S. Marks in Support of Notice of Removal. Filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Foster Wheeler LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - E) (Marks, Christopher) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of Removal of Case Number 18CV56916 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5899478 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Foster Wheeler LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Marks, Christopher) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bryan Steam LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where OfficeMax North America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where C.H. MURPHY/CLARK-ULLMAN, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY is a litigant