This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:48:52 (UTC).

Kissick v. City Of Mesa, Arizona et al

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Kissick filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against City Of Mesa, Arizona. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Rebecca R. Pallmeyer and Iain D. Johnston. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-50117

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rebecca R. Pallmeyer

Referral Judge

Iain D. Johnston

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lloyd P. Kissick

Rockford, IL 61108

Defendants

City Of Mesa Police Department

City Of Mesa, Arizona

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER: Motion for transfer #9 is granted. This case is ordered transferred to the District of Arizona, and is terminated without prejudice in this court. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 6/17/2019. Mailed notice. (kp, ) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#9

(#9) MOTION by Plaintiff Lloyd P. Kissick For Equitable Transfer (pg, ) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#11

(#11) TRANSFERRED to the District of Arizona the electronic record. (kp, ) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (pg, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#3

(#3) PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Lloyd P. Kissick (pg, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Lloyd P. Kissick; Jury Demand. (pg, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#5

(#5) Pursuant to the Second Amended General Order 19-0007, dated 3/28/2019, this case is assigned to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer and referred generally to the Honorable Iain D. Johnston. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/28/2019.(jp, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#7

(#7) Proof of Service filed by Plaintiff Lloyd P. Kissick regarding complaint served on Mesa Police Department, City Of Mesa on 5/20/19(Summonses have not been issued by the court as of 5/22/19) (pg, ) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

#8

(#8) RESPONSE To Notification Of Docket Entry by Plaintiff Lloyd P. Kissick (pg, ) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

#6

(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Plaintiff has alleged that in May 2017, he was arrested on a warrant and subjected to excessive force by officers of the City of Mesa, Arizona. He names as Defendants the City of Mesa and the Mesa Police Department; he has not identified any individual officer who alleged violated his rights. The incident occurred in Arizona. Nothing about these allegations suggests that the court would have personal jurisdiction over the named Defendants, or over any individuals who might later be named as having been involved. Nor does it appear that venue is proper. Plaintiff is directed within 14 days to show cause in writing why this case should not be dismissed without prejudice to re-filing in the District of Arizona. Mailed notice. (etv, ) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • ELECTRONIC Acknowledgement of case transferred to the DISTRICT OF ARIZONA as case 2:19-cv-04620, filed 07/03/2019. (jjr, ) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) TRANSFERRED to the District of Arizona the electronic record. (kp, ) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER: Motion for transfer #9 is granted. This case is ordered transferred to the District of Arizona, and is terminated without prejudice in this court. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 6/17/2019. Mailed notice. (kp, ) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION by Plaintiff Lloyd P. Kissick For Equitable Transfer (pg, ) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RESPONSE To Notification Of Docket Entry by Plaintiff Lloyd P. Kissick (pg, ) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Proof of Service filed by Plaintiff Lloyd P. Kissick regarding complaint served on Mesa Police Department, City Of Mesa on 5/20/19(Summonses have not been issued by the court as of 5/22/19) (pg, ) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Plaintiff has alleged that in May 2017, he was arrested on a warrant and subjected to excessive force by officers of the City of Mesa, Arizona. He names as Defendants the City of Mesa and the Mesa Police Department; he has not identified any individual officer who alleged violated his rights. The incident occurred in Arizona. Nothing about these allegations suggests that the court would have personal jurisdiction over the named Defendants, or over any individuals who might later be named as having been involved. Nor does it appear that venue is proper. Plaintiff is directed within 14 days to show cause in writing why this case should not be dismissed without prejudice to re-filing in the District of Arizona. Mailed notice. (etv, ) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Pursuant to the Second Amended General Order 19-0007, dated 3/28/2019, this case is assigned to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer and referred generally to the Honorable Iain D. Johnston. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/28/2019.(jp, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • (#4) PAYMENT of Filing fee $ 400. #46243004364 (pg, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Lloyd P. Kissick (pg, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (pg, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Lloyd P. Kissick; Jury Demand. (pg, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.