This case was last updated from PACER on 08/10/2021 at 09:00:09 (UTC).

Kisner v. Medtronic Inc et al

Case Summary

On 06/11/2021 Kisner filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Medtronic Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is David C Norton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01767

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David C Norton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Delmas Kisner

Defendants

Eric Dardozzi

Medtronic Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Curtis Elliott Bostic

Attorney at Bostic Law Firm

Po Box 31863

Charleston, SC 29417

Christopher Michael Ramsey

Attorney at Bostic Law Group PA

2236 Ashley Crossing Drive

Charleston, SC 29414

Defendant Attorneys

Molly Hood Craig

Attorney at Hood Law Firm LLC

172 Meeting Street

Charleston, SC 29401

Virginia Rogers Floyd

Attorney at Hood Law Firm LLC

172 Meeting Street

Charleston, SC 29401

 

Court Documents

17 #5

Proposed Order

17 #4

Certificate of Good Standing-Massachusettes

17 #3

Certificate of Good Standing-New York

17 #2

Certificate of Good Standing-Georgia

17 #1

Application/Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice Admission

#17

(#17) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Evan Holden ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-10002499) by Eric Dardozzi, Medtronic Inc. Response to Motion due by 8/20/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Application/Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Certificate of Good Standing-Georgia, #3 Certificate of Good Standing-New York, #4 Certificate of Good Standing-Massachusettes, #5 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Craig, Molly) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

#16

(#16) RESPONSE in Support re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by Medtronic Inc. (Craig, Molly) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

#14

(#14) RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by Delmas Kisner.Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/3/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Ramsey, Christopher) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

#13

(#13) REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by Delmas Kisner. (Ramsey, Christopher) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

11 #1

Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Eric Dardozzi

#11

(#11) RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by Eric Dardozzi, Medtronic Inc.Reply to Response to Motion due by 7/23/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Eric Dardozzi)(Craig, Molly) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

9 #1

Memo in Support

#9

(#9) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Eric Dardozzi. Response to Motion due by 7/27/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)No proposed order.(Craig, Molly) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

6 #2

Exhibit Ex B - Linkedin Page for Dardozzi

6 #1

Exhibit Ex A - Affidavit of Service on Dardozzi

#6

(#6) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Delmas Kisner. Response to Motion due by 7/16/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - Affidavit of Service on Dardozzi, #2 Exhibit Ex B - Linkedin Page for Dardozzi)No proposed order.(Ramsey, Christopher) Modified on 7/20/2021 to reference Supplement #10 (rshu, ). (Entered: 07/02/2021)

5 #1

Memo in Support

#5

(#5) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Medtronic Inc. Response to Motion due by 7/2/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)No proposed order.(Craig, Molly) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Evan Holden ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-10002499) by Eric Dardozzi, Medtronic Inc. Response to Motion due by 8/20/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Application/Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Certificate of Good Standing-Georgia, #3 Certificate of Good Standing-New York, #4 Certificate of Good Standing-Massachusettes, #5 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Craig, Molly) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) RESPONSE in Support re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by Medtronic Inc. (Craig, Molly) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING Telephone Conference re: 5 and 9 Motions to Dismiss and 6 Motion to Remand set for 9/14/2021 11:00 AM cancelled and RESCHEDULED TO: Telephone Conference re: #5 and #9 Motions to Dismiss and #6 Motion to Remand set for 9/16/2021 1:30 PM before Honorable David C Norton. (hcor, ) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by Delmas Kisner.Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/3/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Ramsey, Christopher) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by Delmas Kisner. (Ramsey, Christopher) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference re: #5 and #9 Motions to Dismiss and #6 Motion to Remand set for 9/14/2021 11:00 AM before Honorable David C Norton. Call-in instructions will be distributed at a later date. (hcor, ) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by Eric Dardozzi, Medtronic Inc.Reply to Response to Motion due by 7/23/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Eric Dardozzi)(Craig, Molly) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUPPLEMENT by Delmas Kisner to #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - Affidavit of Service on Dardozzi)(Ramsey, Christopher) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Eric Dardozzi. Response to Motion due by 7/27/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)No proposed order.(Craig, Molly) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by Medtronic Inc. (Craig, Molly) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by Delmas Kisner.Reply to Response to Motion due by 7/9/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Ramsey, Christopher) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Delmas Kisner. Response to Motion due by 7/16/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - Affidavit of Service on Dardozzi, #2 Exhibit Ex B - Linkedin Page for Dardozzi)No proposed order.(Ramsey, Christopher) Modified on 7/20/2021 to reference Supplement #10 (rshu, ). (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Medtronic Inc. Response to Motion due by 7/2/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)No proposed order.(Craig, Molly) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Medtronic Inc.(jbry, ) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Medtronic Inc.(jbry, ) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charleston County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2021-CP-10-02189. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9900676), filed by Medtronic Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Service, #2 Exhibit Docket Report, #3 State Court Documents Summons and Complaint, #4 Exhibit State Court Draft Removal Doc, #5 Certificate of Service)(jbry, ) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Medtronic, Inc. is a litigant