This case was last updated from PACER on 11/27/2019 at 07:02:55 (UTC).

Kirkendoll v. Entertainment Acquisitions, L.L.C.

Case Summary

On 09/28/2019 Kirkendoll filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Entertainment Acquisitions, L L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sarah S. Vance, Dana Douglas, Janis van Meerveld and Wendy B Vitter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-12854

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Sarah S. Vance

Wendy B Vitter

Referral Judges

Dana Douglas

Janis van Meerveld

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alan Kirkendoll

Defendant

Entertainment Acquisitions, L.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mark Christopher Landry

Attorney at Newman, Mathis, Brady & Spedale, PLC

433 Metairie Road, Suite 600

Metairie, LA 70005

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES: ORDERED that Unopposed Motion to Consolidate Cases (R. Doc. 26 in master case) is GRANTED and Civil Action No. 19-7942-WBV-JVM, Kirkendoll v. Entertainment Acquisitions, LLC and Civil Action No. 19-12854-WBV-JVM, Kirkendoll v. Entertainment Acquisitions, LLC, are CONSOLIDATED as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 10/10/2019.(jeg) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

#9

(#9) Affidavit of Service Returned Executed; Entertainment Acquisitions, L.L.C. served on 10/2/2019, answer due 10/23/2019. (Landry, Mark) Modified text on 10/10/2019 (clw). (Entered: 10/09/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. Judge Sarah S. Vance, Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 10/2/19. (NEF: District Judge, Magistrate Judge) (ko) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

#7

(#7) Notice of Related Case(s) civil action no. 19-07942 by Alan Kirkendoll. (Landry, Mark) Modified text on 9/30/2019 (mm). (Entered: 09/30/2019)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Entertainment Acquisitions, L.L.C. (mm) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Submitted for Issuance (Landry, Mark) (Main Document 3 replaced on 9/30/2019) (mm). (Entered: 09/28/2019)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet Submitted (Landry, Mark) (Entered: 09/28/2019)

1 #1

Promissory Note

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Entertainment Acquisitions, L.L.C. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7877642) filed by Alan Kirkendoll. (Attachments: #1 Promissory Note)Attorney Mark Christopher Landry added to party Alan Kirkendoll(pty:pla).(Landry, Mark) (Entered: 09/28/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES: ORDERED that Unopposed Motion to Consolidate Cases (R. Doc. 26 in master case) is GRANTED and Civil Action No. 19-7942-WBV-JVM, Kirkendoll v. Entertainment Acquisitions, LLC and Civil Action No. 19-12854-WBV-JVM, Kirkendoll v. Entertainment Acquisitions, LLC, are CONSOLIDATED as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 10/10/2019.(jeg) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Affidavit of Service Returned Executed; Entertainment Acquisitions, L.L.C. served on 10/2/2019, answer due 10/23/2019. (Landry, Mark) Modified text on 10/10/2019 (clw). (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. Judge Sarah S. Vance, Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 10/2/19. (NEF: District Judge, Magistrate Judge) (ko) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Notice of Related Case(s) civil action no. 19-07942 by Alan Kirkendoll. (Landry, Mark) Modified text on 9/30/2019 (mm). (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #3 Summons Submitted for Issuance. **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the summons. The pdf should not have the blue boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action.** (mm) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Entertainment Acquisitions, L.L.C. (mm) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • (#4) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (aj) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Submitted for Issuance (Landry, Mark) (Main Document 3 replaced on 9/30/2019) (mm). (Entered: 09/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Civil Cover Sheet Submitted (Landry, Mark) (Entered: 09/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Entertainment Acquisitions, L.L.C. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7877642) filed by Alan Kirkendoll. (Attachments: #1 Promissory Note)Attorney Mark Christopher Landry added to party Alan Kirkendoll(pty:pla).(Landry, Mark) (Entered: 09/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.