This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/07/2019 at 07:54:21 (UTC).

Kirk et al v. Retirement Committee of CHS/Community Health Systems, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/08/2019 Kirk filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Retirement Committee of CHS/Community Health Systems, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Barbara D. Holmes and William L. Campbell, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00689

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Barbara D. Holmes

Presiding Judge

William L. Campbell, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Perry Ayoob

Dawn Karzenoski

Becky Kirk

Defendants

Principal Global Investors, LLC

Principal Life Insurance Company

Retirement Committee of CHS/Community Health Systems, Inc.

John and Jane Does 1-20

Principal Management Corporation

CHS/Community Health Systems, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Carl F. Engstrom

Attorney at Nichols Kaster PLLP

4600 Ids Center, 80 S 8Th Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Jacob T. Schutz

Attorney at Nichols Kaster PLLP

4600 Ids Center, 80 S 8Th Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Brock J. Specht

Attorney at Nichols Kaster PLLP

4600 Ids Center, 80 S 8Th Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Kai H. Richter

Attorney at Nichols Kaster PLLP

4600 Ids Center, 80 S 8Th Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Jerry E. Martin

Attorney at Barrett Johnston Martin & Garrison, LLC

414 Union Street, Suite 900

Nashville, TN 37219

David W. Garrison

Attorney at Barrett Johnston Martin & Garrison, LLC

414 Union Street, Suite 900

Nashville, TN 37219

Paul J. Lukas

Attorney at Nichols Kaster PLLP

4600 Ids Center, 80 S 8Th Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Defendant Attorneys

Leslie Goff Sanders

Attorney at Webb Sanders PLLC (Nashville Office)

611 Commerce Street, Suite 3102

Nashville, TN 37203

Leslie C. Behaunek

Attorney at Nyemaster Goode, P.C.

700 Walnut Street, Suite 1600

Des Moines, IA 50309

Samuel I. Levin

Attorney at Groom Law Group, Chartered

1701 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw, Suite 1200

Washington, DC 20006

Daniel Caden Crowell

Attorney at Webb Sanders PLLC (Nashville Office)

611 Commerce Street, Suite 3102

Nashville, TN 37203

Kara P. Wheatley

Attorney at Groom Law Group, Chartered

1701 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw, Suite 1200

Washington, DC 20006

Lars C. Golumbic

Attorney at Groom Law Group, Chartered

1701 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw, Suite 1200

Washington, DC 20006

Angel A. West

Attorney at Nyemaster Goode, P.C.

700 Walnut Street, Suite 1600

Des Moines, IA 50309

George H. Cate, III

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP (Nashville, TN Office)

1600 Division Street, Suite 700, P.O Box 340025

Nashville, TN 37203-0025

Jeffrey W. Sheehan

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP (Nashville, TN Office)

1600 Division Street, Suite 700, P.O Box 340025

Nashville, TN 37203-0025

Howard Shapiro

Attorney at Proskauer Rose, LLP (New Orleans Office)

650 Poydras Street, Suite 1800

New Orleans, LA 70130

Stacey C.S. Cerrone

Attorney at Proskauer Rose, LLP (New Orleans Office)

650 Poydras Street, Suite 1800

New Orleans, LA 70130

Lindsey H. Chopin

Attorney at Proskauer Rose, LLP (New Orleans Office)

650 Poydras Street, Suite 1800

New Orleans, LA 70130

 

Court Documents

#48

47 #1

Attachment Certificate of Good Standing

#47

#46

#45

31 #1

Attachment Certificate of Good Standing

#31

30 #1

Attachment Certificate of Good Standing

#19

7 #1

Attachment - Certificate of Good Standing for Brock J. Specht

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Attachment Civil Cover Sheet

#1

70 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) ORDER granting #47 Motion for Kara P. Wheatley to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 9/30/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketDC Bar status verified as active for Kara P. Wheatley. (gb) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) MOTION for attorney Kara P. Wheatley to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3000693) by Principal Global Investors, LLC, Principal Life Insurance Company, Principal Management Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Crowell, Daniel) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes: Telephone Conference held on 9/9/2019. (Tape #not recorded.) (Hearing lasted :30)(jwc) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketSet/Reset Hearings: Initial Case Management Conference reset for 11/1/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (dt) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the #1 Complaint. The time for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to and including October 18, 2019. Upon the request of CHS Defendants counsel that the initial case management conference presently scheduled for September 30, 2019 be rescheduled due to a conflict with Rosh Hashana, the initial case management conference is RESCHEDULED for November 1, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. (CT) in Courtroom 764, U.S. Courthouse, 801 Broadway, Nashville, Tennessee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 9/9/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) ORDER granting #31 Motion for Angel A. West to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 9/9/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) ORDER granting #30 Motion for Leslie C. Behaunek to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 9/9/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) ORDER granting #41 Motion for Samuel I. Levin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 9/9/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) ORDER granting #40 Motion for Lars C. Golumbic to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 9/9/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for attorney Carl F. Engstrom to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2974875) by Perry Ayoob, Dawn Karzenoski, Becky Kirk. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing for Carl F. Engstrom)(Martin, Jerry) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for attorney Brock J. Specht to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2974854) by Perry Ayoob, Dawn Karzenoski, Becky Kirk. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Certificate of Good Standing for Brock J. Specht)(Martin, Jerry) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 8/13/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketNOTICE TO COUNSEL Kai H. Richter, Paul J. Lukas, Carl F. Engstrom, Brock J. Specht, Jacob T. Schutz: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 9/3/2019. (gb) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons issued as to CHS/Community Health Systems, Inc., Principal Global Investors, LLC, Principal Life Insurance Company, Principal Management Corporation and Retirement Committee of CHS/Community Health Systems, Inc.. (gb) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/30/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (gb) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Jerry E. Martin and David W. Garrison. MN State Bar status verified as active for Kai H. Richter, Paul J. Lukas, Carl F. Engstrom, Brock J. Specht and Jacob T. Schutz. (gb) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (gb) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (gb) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against CHS/Community Health Systems, Inc., John and Jane Does 1-20, Principal Global Investors, LLC, Principal Life Insurance Company, Principal Management Corporation, Retirement Committee of CHS/Community Health Systems, Inc. (Filing fee paid $400, Receipt number 0650-2968667), filed by Perry Ayoob, Dawn Karzenoski, Becky Kirk. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(gb) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Principal Management Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where CHS/Community Health Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where PRINCIPAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY AN IOWA is a litigant