This case was last updated from PACER on 02/11/2020 at 07:56:05 (UTC).

Kinsinger et al v. Cirrus Design Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 12/13/2019 Kinsinger filed a Personal Injury - Airplane lawsuit against Cirrus Design Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee Yeakel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01212

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Airplane

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lee Yeakel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kerri Kinsinger

David Kinsinger

Joseph Kinsinger

Jacob Kinsinger

Defendants

Garmin USA, Inc.

Garmin, LTD.

Garmin AT, Inc.

Cirrus Design Corporation

Garmin International, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ladd Charles Sanger

Attorney at Slack Davis Sanger LLP

3500 Maple Ave Ste 1250, Suite 1250

Dallas, TX 75219

Defendant Attorneys

Ross Cunningham

Attorney at Cunningham Swaim, LLP

7557 Rambler Road, Suite 400

Dallas, TX 75231

Joseph R. Alexander, Jr.

Attorney at Cunningham Swaim LLP

7557 Rambler Road, Suite 400

Dallas, TX 75321

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12965516). No Summons requested at this time, filed by David Kinsinger. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sanger, Ladd) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by David Kinsinger. (Sanger, Ladd) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Cirrus Design Corporation, Garmin AT, Inc., Garmin International, Inc., Garmin, LTD, Garmin USA, Inc. (lt) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Kinsinger as to Cirrus Design Corporation. Waiver sent on 12/16/2019, answer due 2/14/2020. (Sanger, Ladd) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#5

Notice of Correction: re #5 Certificate of Service, #6 Certificate of Service. Filer selected wrong event, correction has been made. No further action is required. Please note this information for future filing purposes. (td) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#6

Notice of Correction: re #5 Certificate of Service, #6 Certificate of Service. Filer selected wrong event, correction has been made. No further action is required. Please note this information for future filing purposes. (td) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#19

(#19) ORDER regarding case style. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

#18

(#18) ORDER on Plaintiffs' Notice of Dismissal as to Certain Defendants. Defendants Garmin USA, Inc., Garmin AT, Inc., and Garmin, LTD. dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

#17

(#17) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cirrus Design Corporation amending, filed by David Kinsinger.(Sanger, Ladd) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

16 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order on Plaintiffs' Notice of Dismissal

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by David Kinsinger (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Plaintiffs' Notice of Dismissal)(Sanger, Ladd) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

#14

(#14) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ross Cunningham for Joseph R. Alexander, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13124629) by on behalf of Garmin AT, Inc., Garmin International, Inc., Garmin USA, Inc., Garmin, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cunningham, Ross) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#15

(#15) ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joseph R. Alexander, Jr. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

14 #1

Proposed Order

#13

(#13) Pro Hac Vice Letter to Joseph R. Alexander, Jr. (td) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#11

(#11) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint and Answer by Garmin AT, Inc., Garmin International, Inc., Garmin USA, Inc., Garmin, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cunningham, Ross) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#12

(#12) ORDER GRANTING #11 Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER regarding case style. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER on Plaintiffs' Notice of Dismissal as to Certain Defendants. Defendants Garmin USA, Inc., Garmin AT, Inc., and Garmin, LTD. dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cirrus Design Corporation amending, filed by David Kinsinger.(Sanger, Ladd) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by David Kinsinger (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Plaintiffs' Notice of Dismissal)(Sanger, Ladd) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joseph R. Alexander, Jr. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ross Cunningham for Joseph R. Alexander, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13124629) by on behalf of Garmin AT, Inc., Garmin International, Inc., Garmin USA, Inc., Garmin, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cunningham, Ross) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Pro Hac Vice Letter to Joseph R. Alexander, Jr. (td) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER GRANTING #11 Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint and Answer by Garmin AT, Inc., Garmin International, Inc., Garmin USA, Inc., Garmin, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cunningham, Ross) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Kinsinger. Garmin USA, Inc. served on 1/6/2020, answer due 1/27/2020. (Sanger, Ladd) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Correction: re #5 Certificate of Service, #6 Certificate of Service. Filer selected wrong event, correction has been made. No further action is required. Please note this information for future filing purposes. (td) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jacob Kinsinger, David Kinsinger, Joseph Kinsinger, Kerri Kinsinger. Garmin International, Inc. served on 1/6/2020, answer due 1/27/2020 (Sanger, Ladd) Modified on 1/9/2020 to correct event (td). (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jacob Kinsinger, David Kinsinger, Joseph Kinsinger, Kerri Kinsinger. Garmin AT, Inc. served on 1/6/2020, answer due 1/27/2020. (Sanger, Ladd) Modified on 1/9/2020 to correct event (td). (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Kinsinger as to Cirrus Design Corporation. Waiver sent on 12/16/2019, answer due 2/14/2020. (Sanger, Ladd) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Cirrus Design Corporation, Garmin AT, Inc., Garmin International, Inc., Garmin, LTD, Garmin USA, Inc. (lt) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by David Kinsinger. (Sanger, Ladd) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by David Kinsinger. (dl) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower. (dl) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12965516). No Summons requested at this time, filed by David Kinsinger. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sanger, Ladd) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.