This case was last updated from PACER on 03/08/2019 at 07:37:16 (UTC).

Kinne v. DePuy Orthopaedics Inc et al

Case Summary

On 01/07/2019 Kinne filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against DePuy Orthopaedics Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ed Kinkeade. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00031

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ed Kinkeade

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sherry Kinne

Defendants

DePuy Orthopaedics Inc

Johnson and Johnson Services Inc

Does 1 through 50, inclusive

Johnson and Johnson

Thomas P Schmalzried, MD

Special Master

Special Master

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Melanie Meneses Palmer

Attorney at Kiesel Law LLP

8648 Wilshire Boulevard

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

Cherisse Heidi A Cleofe

Attorney at Kiesel Law LLP

8648 Wilshire Boulevard

Beverly Hills, CA 90211-2910

Paul R Kiesel

Attorney at Kiesel Law LLP

8648 Wilshire Boulevard

Beverly Hills, CA 90211-2910

Defendant Attorneys

David C Allen

Attorney at Barnes and Thornburg LLP

2029 Century Park East, Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90067-2904

Kelley S Olah

Attorney at Barnes and Thornburg LLP

2029 Century Park East, Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Jessica D Miller

Attorney at Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

1440 New York Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Michael V Powell

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 2800

Dallas, TX 75201-6776

Special Master Attorney

James M Stanton-2244

Attorney at Stanton LLP

1717 Main Street, Suite 3800

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

16 #1

*Restricted*

#16

(#16) Case electronically transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:18-cv-07736. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. (Entered: 01/07/2019)

#15

(#15) Conditional Transfer Order - 307 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2244, transferring case to USDC, Northern District of Texas and assigned to Honorable James Edgar Kinkeade. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 1/7/2019.] (Entered: 01/04/2019)

#11

(#11) ORDER RE STIPULATION TO STAY ALL PROCEEDINGS by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Stay Case, #10 . A status conference is set for October 11, 2018 at 8:30 a.m. pending the Judicial Panel's decision whether to transfer the case to MDL No. 2244. Case stayed. (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 1/7/2019.] (Entered: 09/17/2018)

10 #1

Proposed Order Regarding Stipulation to Stay All Proceedings

#10

(#10) STIPULATION to Stay Case pending a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Defendants DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Johnson and Johnson, Johnson and Johnson Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Regarding Stipulation to Stay All Proceedings)(Anderson-Thompson, Gabrielle) [Transferred from California Central on 1/7/2019.] (Entered: 09/12/2018)

#9

(#9) Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials by Judge George H. Wu. (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 1/7/2019.] (Entered: 09/11/2018)

#7

(#7) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:11-cv-02441 GW (JCx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero and Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-07736 GW (JCx). Signed by Judge George H. Wu (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 1/7/2019.] (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 1/7/2019.] (Entered: 09/06/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 1/7/2019.] (Entered: 09/06/2018)

4 #8

Part 8 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases

4 #3

Part 3 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases

4 #2

Part 2 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases

4 #1

Part 1 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc.; an Indiana Corporation, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., a New Jersey Corporation, Johnson & Johnson, a New Jersey corporation. Transferred to Judge Wu (Attachments: #1 Part 1 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases, #2 Part 2 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases, #3 Part 3 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases, #4 Part 4 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases, #5 Part 5 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases, #6 Part 6 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases, #7 Part 7 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases, #8 Part 8 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases)(Anderson-Thompson, Gabrielle) [Transferred from California Central on 1/7/2019.] (Entered: 09/05/2018)

1 #2

Exhibit 2 to Notice of Removal of Action

1 #1

Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal of Action

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number BC714172 Receipt No: 0973-22372571 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., a New Jersey Corporation, Johnson & Johnson, a New Jersey corporation, DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc.; an Indiana Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal of Action, #2 Exhibit 2 to Notice of Removal of Action) (Attorney Gabrielle Jaynea Anderson-Thompson added to party DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc.; an Indiana Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Gabrielle Jaynea Anderson-Thompson added to party Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., a New Jersey Corporation (pty:dft), Attorney Gabrielle Jaynea Anderson-Thompson added to party Johnson & Johnson, a New Jersey corporation(pty:dft))(Anderson-Thompson, Gabrielle) [Transferred from California Central on 1/7/2019.] (Entered: 09/05/2018)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Case electronically transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:18-cv-07736. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Conditional Transfer Order - 307 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2244, transferring case to USDC, Northern District of Texas and assigned to Honorable James Edgar Kinkeade. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 1/7/2019.] (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • (#14) TEXT ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H. Wu: The Court CONTINUES the Status Conference previously set for 12/17/2018 to 01/17/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu pending the Judicial Panel's decision whether to transfer the case to MDL No. 2244. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 1/7/2019.] (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • (#13) TEXT ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H. Wu: The Court CONTINUES the Status Conference previously set for 11/15/2018 to 12/17/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu pending the Judicial Panel's decision whether to transfer the case to MDL No. 2244. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 1/7/2019.] (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • (#12) TEXT ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H. Wu: The Court CONTINUES the Status Conference previously set for 10/11/2018 to 11/15/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu pending the Judicial Panel's decision whether to transfer the case to MDL No. 2244. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 1/7/2019.] (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER RE STIPULATION TO STAY ALL PROCEEDINGS by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Stay Case, #10 . A status conference is set for October 11, 2018 at 8:30 a.m. pending the Judicial Panel's decision whether to transfer the case to MDL No. 2244. Case stayed. (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 1/7/2019.] (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) STIPULATION to Stay Case pending a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Defendants DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Johnson and Johnson, Johnson and Johnson Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Regarding Stipulation to Stay All Proceedings)(Anderson-Thompson, Gabrielle) [Transferred from California Central on 1/7/2019.] (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials by Judge George H. Wu. (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 1/7/2019.] (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • (#8) TEXT ONLY ENTRY - TRANSFER OF CASE TO JUDGE WU AND ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge George H Wu; This action has been reassigned to the Honorable George H. Wu, U.S. District Judge and the Honorable Jacqueline Chooljian, U.S. Magistrate Judge. The Court sets a Status Conference for October 11, 2018 at 8:30 a.m. pending the Judicial Panel's decision whether to transfer the case to MDL No. 2244.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 1/7/2019.] (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:11-cv-02441 GW (JCx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero and Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-07736 GW (JCx). Signed by Judge George H. Wu (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 1/7/2019.] (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 1/7/2019.] (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 1/7/2019.] (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Does 1 through 50, inclusive, Johnson and Johnson, Johnson and Johnson Services, Inc., Thomas Schmalzried, Thomas P. Schmalzried, M.D. A Professional CorporationJury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Sherry Kinne. Filed in State Court on 7/19/18 Submitted with attachment 2 to notice of removal #1 (car) [Transferred from California Central on 1/7/2019.] (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc.; an Indiana Corporation, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., a New Jersey Corporation, Johnson & Johnson, a New Jersey corporation. Transferred to Judge Wu (Attachments: #1 Part 1 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases, #2 Part 2 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases, #3 Part 3 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases, #4 Part 4 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases, #5 Part 5 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases, #6 Part 6 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases, #7 Part 7 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases, #8 Part 8 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases)(Anderson-Thompson, Gabrielle) [Transferred from California Central on 1/7/2019.] (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certification of Interested Parties filed by Defendants DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc.; an Indiana Corporation, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., a New Jersey Corporation, Johnson & Johnson, a New Jersey corporation, identifying Johnson & Johnson International, DePuy Synthes, Inc.. (Anderson-Thompson, Gabrielle) [Transferred from California Central on 1/7/2019.] (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc.; an Indiana Corporation, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., a New Jersey Corporation, Johnson & Johnson, a New Jersey corporation. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A to Civil Cover Sheet)(Anderson-Thompson, Gabrielle) [Transferred from California Central on 1/7/2019.] (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number BC714172 Receipt No: 0973-22372571 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., a New Jersey Corporation, Johnson & Johnson, a New Jersey corporation, DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc.; an Indiana Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal of Action, #2 Exhibit 2 to Notice of Removal of Action) (Attorney Gabrielle Jaynea Anderson-Thompson added to party DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc.; an Indiana Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Gabrielle Jaynea Anderson-Thompson added to party Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., a New Jersey Corporation (pty:dft), Attorney Gabrielle Jaynea Anderson-Thompson added to party Johnson & Johnson, a New Jersey corporation(pty:dft))(Anderson-Thompson, Gabrielle) [Transferred from California Central on 1/7/2019.] (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.