This case was last updated from PACER on 11/08/2020 at 09:18:50 (UTC).

Kingtom Aluminio SLR v. Air Master Windows and Doors

Case Summary

On 09/09/2020 Kingtom Aluminio SLR filed a Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery lawsuit against Air Master Windows and Doors. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jay A. Garcia-Gregory. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01465

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Puerto Rico District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jay A. Garcia-Gregory

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KINGTOM ALUMINIO SLR

Defendant

Air Master Windows and Doors

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Maria Soledad Lozada-Figueroa

Attorney at Lozada Law & Associates

Po Box 9023888

San Juan, PR 00902-3888

Defendant Attorney

Jean Gabriel Vidal-Font

Attorney at Ferraiuoli LLC

Po Box 195168

San Juan, PR 00919-5168

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) MOTION for extension of time until November 25, 2020 to Plead or Otherwise Defend filed by Jean Gabriel Vidal-Font on behalf of Air Master Windows and Doors Responses due by 11/4/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vidal-Font, Jean) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kingtom Aluminio SLR upon Air Master Windows and Doors served on 10/5/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (mg) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

4 #1

Summons

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Air Master Windows and Doors. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

3 #1

Summons

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing Summons for Issuance as to Air Master Windows and Doors filed by Maria Soledad Lozada-Figueroa on behalf of Kingtom Aluminio SLR Responses due by 10/14/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Lozada-Figueroa, Maria) Modified on 10/1/2020 (to edit docket title and event. mg). (Entered: 09/30/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Air Master Windows and Doors ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-7012011.), filed by KINGTOM ALUMINIO SLR. Service due by 12/8/2020, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lozada-Figueroa, Maria) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for extension of time until November 25, 2020 to Plead or Otherwise Defend filed by Jean Gabriel Vidal-Font on behalf of Air Master Windows and Doors Responses due by 11/4/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vidal-Font, Jean) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kingtom Aluminio SLR upon Air Master Windows and Doors served on 10/5/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (mg) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Air Master Windows and Doors. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing Summons for Issuance as to Air Master Windows and Doors filed by Maria Soledad Lozada-Figueroa on behalf of Kingtom Aluminio SLR Responses due by 10/14/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Lozada-Figueroa, Maria) Modified on 10/1/2020 (to edit docket title and event. mg). (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (arg) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Air Master Windows and Doors ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-7012011.), filed by KINGTOM ALUMINIO SLR. Service due by 12/8/2020, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lozada-Figueroa, Maria) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less