This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/02/2020 at 09:27:13 (UTC).

KING v. PREMIER PAN COMPANY, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/02/2020 KING filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against PREMIER PAN COMPANY, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nora Barry Fischer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00003

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nora Barry Fischer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRITTANY VANCE KING

Defendant

PREMIER PAN COMPANY, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Samuel J. Cordes

Attorney at Rothman Gordon, P.C.

310 Grant Street, 3Rd Floor, Grant Building

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Emily E. Town

Attorney at Rothman Gordon

310 Grant Street, Third Floor, Grant Building

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BRITTANY VANCE KING. PREMIER PAN COMPANY, INC. waiver sent on 1/6/2020, answer due 3/6/2020. (Town, Emily) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER ON MOTIONS PRACTICE (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 1/3/20. (jg) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 1/3/20. (jg) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jg) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Emily E. Town on behalf of BRITTANY VANCE KING. (Town, Emily) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to PREMIER PAN COMPANY, INC. (jv) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #2

Summons as to Premier Pan Company, Inc.

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against PREMIER PAN COMPANY, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5411997), filed by BRITTANY VANCE KING. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons as to Premier Pan Company, Inc.) (jv) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BRITTANY VANCE KING. PREMIER PAN COMPANY, INC. waiver sent on 1/6/2020, answer due 3/6/2020. (Town, Emily) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER ON MOTIONS PRACTICE (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 1/3/20. (jg) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 1/3/20. (jg) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jg) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Emily E. Town on behalf of BRITTANY VANCE KING. (Town, Emily) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #2 Summons Issued. ERROR: Incorrect document attached. CORRECTION: Document removed from public view since the entry was completed correctly as #3 Summons issued. This message is for informational purposes only. (jv) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to PREMIER PAN COMPANY, INC. (jv) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to PREMIER PAN COMPANY, INC. (jv) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against PREMIER PAN COMPANY, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5411997), filed by BRITTANY VANCE KING. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons as to Premier Pan Company, Inc.) (jv) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Samuel J. Cordes

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Emily E. Town Esq.